Oltremari et al v. State Farm Bank, F.S.B. et al
Plaintiff: Rosalie Oltremari and Paul Oltremari
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, F.S.B., State Farm Bank and State Farm Bank, F.S.B.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00414
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendant, State Farm Bank, F.S.B's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. State Farm Bank shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/17/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Farm Bank, F.S.B.. (Vescovo, Christopher)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Vescovo on behalf of State Farm Bank, F.S.B. (Vescovo, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC SHALL respond to the Complaint on or before December 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/22/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Yoakum, Brian)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Oltremari, Rosalie Oltremari. State Farm Bank, F.S.B. served on 11/5/2019. (Swan, Philip)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Oltremari, Rosalie Oltremari. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/4/2019. (Swan, Philip)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/2019. (BJL)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/2019. (BJL)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/2019. (BJL)
October 21, 2019 Error Docket entry (BJL) Modified on 10/23/2019 (BJL).
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, State Farm Bank , F.S.B. (BJL) Modified on 10/23/2019 (BJL).
October 21, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint. (BJL)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel regarding attachments to the #1 Complaint: INFORMATIONAL ONLY. (BJL)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4108841.), filed by Paul Oltremari. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Swan, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oltremari et al v. State Farm Bank, F.S.B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian L Yoakum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Bank, F.S.B.
Represented By: Christopher L Vescovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Oltremari
Represented By: Philip Gordon Swan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Oltremari
Represented By: Philip Gordon Swan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?