Mallett et al v. Holiday Inn et al
Plaintiff: Lance M Mallett
Defendant: Rhonda Hartman and Holiday Inn
Case Number: 3:2019cv00459
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on December 6, 2019. (copy mailed to Mr. Mallett) (AYB)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on December 6, 2019. (copy mailed to Mr. Mallett) (AYB)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on December 6, 2019. (copy mailed to Mr. Mallett) (AYB)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the undersigned finds this case is related to Mallett v. Holiday Inn, et al., No. 3:18-CV-160. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on December 5, 2019. (copy mailed to Lance M Mallett, 2517 Peck Street, Unit 4911, Muskegon Heights, MI 49444) (AYB)
December 5, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AYB)
December 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to Rhonda Hartman and Holiday Inn; returned by mail to pro se plaintiff for service. (AYB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhonda Hartman, Holiday Inn filed by Lance M Mallett. (AYB)
November 13, 2019 Two blank summons forms mailed to pro se plaintiff for completion - one for each defendant (AYB)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (mailed to Mr. Mallett) (AYB)
November 12, 2019 This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Poplin for a related case determination. (AYB)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rhonda Hartman and Holiday Inn (Filing fee $ 400: K3039162) filed by Lance M Mallett, Got the Lead Out LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (AYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallett et al v. Holiday Inn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance M Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?