Webb et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Webb and Christine Webb
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon LLC and Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00461
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of the Withdrawal of Attorney William M. Gage as counsel for Defendants (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of the Withdrawal of Attorney Laura H. Dixon as counsel for Defendants (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of the Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher D. Morris as counsel for Defendants (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of the Withdrawal of Attorney Andrew D. Tharp as counsel for Defendants (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of the Withdrawal of Attorney Christy D. Jones as counsel for Defendants (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita)
November 13, 2019 Filing 92 Case electronically transferred in from the Southern District of West Virginia; SD/WV Case Number 2:12-cv-03136.
October 29, 2019 Filing 91 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7353) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Jerry Blaivas, #2 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4573) Part 1 - Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4573) Part 2 - Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4573) Part 3 - Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4573) Part 4 - Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4574) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4675) Part 1 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4675) Part 2 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (4692) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7333) Notice of Adoption of Motion to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7355) Notice of Adoption of Prior Response of Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7452) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply of Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2809) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #14 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2944) Part 1 - Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #15 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2944) Part 2 - Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #16 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2944) Part 3 - Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #17 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2944) Part 4 - Memo Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #18 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3023) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Neeraj Kohli, #19 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7337) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Neeraj Kohli, #20 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7357) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Neeraj Kohli, #21 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2830) Motion to Exclude Anne Wilson, #22 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2831) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Anne Wilson, #23 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2943) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Anne Wilson, #24 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3025) Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Anne Wilson, #25 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7307) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Anne Wilson, #26 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7352) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Anne Wilson)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 90 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2065) Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2134) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2232) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2910) Notice of Adoption of Response Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7346) Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7461) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7467) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply of Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2041) Motion to Exclude Michael Woods, #9 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2043) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Michael Woods, #10 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2234) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Michael Woods, #11 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (2927) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Michael Woods, #12 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3051) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Michael Woods, #13 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7328) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Michael Woods, #14 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (7376) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Regarding Michael Woods, #15 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3588) Motion to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #16 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3589) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #17 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3758) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #18 Exhibit ECF# 89 Continued - (3840) Reply Brief Supporting Motion to Exclude Jerry Blaivas)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 89 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit (3273) Motion to Limit Opinions of Harry Johnson, #7 Exhibit (3274) Memo in Support of Motion to Limit Opinions of Harry Johnson, #8 Exhibit (3295) Response in Opposition of Motion to Exclude Harry Johnson, #9 Exhibit (3307) Reply in Support of Motion to Limit Harry Johnson, #10 Exhibit (3650) Motion to Exclude Testimony of Harry Johnson, #11 Exhibit (3661) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Harry Johnson, #12 Exhibit (3781) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Harry Johnson, #13 Exhibit (7288) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Harry Johnson, #14 Exhibit (7460)Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Harry Johnson, #15 Exhibit (2039)Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit (2042) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit (2187) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit (2247) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit (2455) Part 1 - Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit (2455) Part 2 - Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #21 Exhibit (2458) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #22 Exhibit (2553) Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #23 Exhibit (2553) Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #24 Exhibit (2553) Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #25 Exhibit (2621) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #26 Exhibit (2839) Part 1 - Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #27 Exhibit (2839) Part 2 - Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #28 Exhibit (2841) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #29 Exhibit (2957) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #30 Exhibit (3037) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #31 Exhibit (7323) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Shelby Thames, #32 Exhibit (7399) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 87 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb. (Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 86 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family Members on dates and at times to be determined. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Amended Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc).[Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Morris, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 80 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Continuing with the presently pending case without any waiver pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb. (Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Filing a Subpoena by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Tharp, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Christine Webb on 9/25/2018 at 9:20 a.m. (Tharp, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Andrew David Tharp on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (Tharp, Andrew) (Modified on 9/24/2018 to remove party filers)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (btm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PRETRIAL ORDER #270 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). Therefore, all such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID. Such stipulations undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiffs friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule may be considered, for good cause shown. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL Panel; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER The Motion filed in MDL 2327 by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 3 Cases to Strike Dr. Shelby F. Thames' Supplemental Reports or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Daubert Motion Based on the Flawed Methodology Employed Therein is GRANTED in part and the second supplemental report is STRICKEN as to the cases in Exhibit A. Insofar as the plaintiffs request additional time for Daubert briefing, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/21/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Shelby Thames, Ph.D.) re: DAUBERT MOTION by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 3 Cases to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames filed in MDL 2327; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Shelby Thames, Ph.D.) filed in MDL 2327 and entered on 9/02/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/21/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Bobby Shull, M.D.) re: MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bobby Shull, M.D. in Certain Wave 3 Cases filed in MDL 2327; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Bobby Shull, M.D.) entered in MDL 2327 on 9/01/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/21/2017. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Anne Wilson, M.B.A.) re: MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Anne Wilson, MBA in Certain Wave 3 Cases filed in MDL 2327; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Anne Wilson) filed in MDL 2327 and entered on 9/01/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/21/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Jerry Blaivas, M.D.) The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Jerry Blaivas, M.D.) entered on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; and to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order-fully adopted herein-those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/21/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) entered on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; and to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order-fully adopted herein-those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Neeraj Kohli, M.D.) re: MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude General-Causation Testimony of Neeraj Kohli, M.D., M.B.A. in Certain Wave 3 Cases filed in MDL 2327; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Neeraj Kohli, M.D.) filed in MDL 2327 and entered on 9/01/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) entered on 9/01/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; and to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order-fully adopted herein-those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Harry Johnson, Jr., M.D.) The Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Harry Johnson, Jr., M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Scott Guelcher, Ph.D.) re: MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D. in Certain Wave 3 Cases filed in MDL 2327; the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Scott Guelcher, Ph.D.) entered in MDL 2327 on 8/31/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Debra Fromer, M.D.) The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Debra Fromer, M.D.) filed in MDL 2327 entered on 8/31/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 case identified in Exhibit A. The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Debra Fromer, M.D.) is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Daniel Elliott, M.D.) The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Daniel Elliott, M.D.) entered on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 3 cases identified in Exhibit A. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-C) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
December 28, 2016 Filing 61 REPLY by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb to #60 Memorandum In Opposition. (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #58 MOTION by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Harry Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Kasten, Martin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb in support of #58 MOTION by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Harry Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Deposition Transcript of Harry W. Johnson, M.D., #2 Exhibit(s) B - Amended Report of Harry Johnson, M.D.)(Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Harry Johnson. (Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 21, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #55 Memorandum in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kasten, Martin) (Modified on 10/22/2016 to correct link to #55 memorandum) (gjb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRETRIAL ORDER # 241 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) dismissing without prejudice Ethicon, LLC from each case identified on Exhibit A, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/12/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 10, 2016 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb in opposition to #48 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PRETRIAL ORDER # 239 (First Amended Docket Control Order - Wave 3 Cases) The PTO # 210 (Docket Control Order Wave 3 Cases) is amended to extend the deadlines for responses and replies to Daubert motions; responses to Daubert motions due 10/11/2016 and reply to response to Daubert motions due 10/21/2016; the remaining provisions remain in force and effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/5/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases) (bdr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #50 Response in Opposition. (Kasten, Martin) (Modified on 10/3/2016 to remove link to #50 response) (gjb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 30, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #51 Notice to Take Deposition of Harold Johnson, M.D. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 26, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb of Harold Johnson M.D. on September 27, 2016 at 2:00 EST (Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 50 RESPONSE by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb in opposition to #44 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #48 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig. (Kasten, Martin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kasten, Martin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #46 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Extend the Deadline to File Daubert Motions; the court GRANTS IN PART the defendants' Motion to the extent that they seek additional time for the filing by plaintiffs of any motion; and the court DENIES IN PART the remainder of the defendants' Motion; directing that if the plaintiffs wish to file a Daubert motion related to Dr. Johnson, they do so on or before 11/30/2016, with responses and replies due pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the courts local rules. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/23/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 46 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Extend the Deadline to File Daubert Motions (Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #44 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Kasten, Martin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kasten, Martin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 30, 2016 Filing 42 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IME by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Christine Webb, Joseph Webb (Broyles, Alyssa) (Modified on 8/31/2016 to add party filers) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 25, 2016 Filing 41 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Christine Webb, Joseph Webb (Broyles, Alyssa) (Modified on 8/25/2016 to add party filers) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 9, 2016 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Martin Aaron Kasten on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Kasten, Martin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb for Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses (Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Certificate of Service (Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb for Responses to Written Discovery Requests (Wallace, Edward) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
June 27, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by J. Adam Wells on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Wells, J.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
June 10, 2016 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Jaykrishna "Jay" Patel on June 29, 2016 at 4:30 p.m. (Attachments: #1 PTO 38)(Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests For Admission to Defendants and Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests For Production of Documents Directed to Defendants (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Second Set of Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff (Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Jaykrishna "Jay" Patel on June 30, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38)(Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
May 11, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Corey G. Raines on behalf of Christine Webb, Joseph Webb. (Raines, Corey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
May 11, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Timothy E. Jackson on behalf of Christine Webb, Joseph Webb. (Jackson, Timothy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
May 10, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Scott Matson on June 30, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38)(Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb for Response to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
March 18, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Joseph Webb on 04/14/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
March 18, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christine Webb on 04/14/16 at 9:00 a.m. (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Discovery by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Ator, T.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Alyssa Jordan Broyles on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Broyles, Alyssa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by T. Michelle Ator on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Ator, T.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kimberly Dickerson Young on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Young, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Smith on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Smith, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER # 210 (Docket Control Order - Wave 3 Cases) The cases on the attached Exhibit A will be known as the "Ethicon Wave 3 Cases." The following deadlines shall apply in the Ethicon Wave 3 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/21/2016; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2016; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 6/06/2016; Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 7/04/2016; Expert disclosure by defendants due by 8/02/2016; Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 8/16/2016; deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 8/30/2016; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/06/2016; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2016; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/03/2016; Filing of Daubert motions due by 9/19/2016; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/07/2016; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/17/2016. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: a consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/09/2016, any response is due by 8/19/2016, and any reply is due by 8/29/2016. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 7/15/2016, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/25/2016. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/18/2015. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 3 Cases) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
December 18, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Scott Matson on May 10, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (all) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
November 14, 2012 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, LLC, re: #14 Amended Short Form Complaint - Ethicon, Inc.. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (gjb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Joseph Webb, Christine Webb for Ethicon, LLC, re: #14 Amended Short Form Complaint (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
November 5, 2012 Filing 14 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Christine Webb, Joseph Webb against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 25, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 17, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 16, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 16, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 16, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
October 10, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 27, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Joseph Webb and Christine Webb for Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies of each mailed to Michael Bowman for service. (jap)[Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Joseph Webb, Christine Webb for Gynecare, re: #1 Complaint. (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Joseph Webb, Christine Webb for Ethicon, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
August 24, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Joseph Webb, Christine Webb for Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. (Bowman, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 13, 2012 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER 10 (Lifting Stay on Discovery) entered on 06/14/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]
July 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1906531. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rea) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Represented By: William M Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare
Represented By: William M Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Alyssa Jordan Broyles
Represented By: Martin Aaron Kasten
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: T. Michelle Ator
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Laura H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Martin Aaron Kasten
Represented By: William M Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Alyssa Jordan Broyles
Represented By: Martin Aaron Kasten
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: T. Michelle Ator
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Laura H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Webb
Represented By: Timothy E. Jackson
Represented By: Corey G. Raines
Represented By: Michael H. Bowman
Represented By: Edward A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Webb
Represented By: Timothy E. Jackson
Represented By: Corey G. Raines
Represented By: Michael H. Bowman
Represented By: Edward A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?