State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. United States of America (JRG3)
Plaintiff: State Farm Indemnity Company, Lexington Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, Illinois National Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Safeco National Insurance Company and AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00470
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 12/4/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 12/4/2019 to indicate c/m to all non-ECF users (ABF).
December 3, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark L. McGuire ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145059.) filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Lexington Insurance Company, General Insurance Company of America, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco National Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Granite State Insurance Company, #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Grotefeld ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145031.) filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, General Insurance Company of America, Lexington Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco National Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, AIG Property Casualty Company, Granite State Insurance Company, #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Dvorak ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145045.) filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, General Insurance Company of America, Lexington Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco National Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, AIG Property Casualty Company, Granite State Insurance Company, #34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emma L. Gaddipati ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145066.) filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, General Insurance Company of America, Lexington Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Safeco National Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, AIG Property Casualty Company, Granite State Insurance Company (ABF)
December 3, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emma L. Gaddipati ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145066.) by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other)(Evans, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark L. McGuire ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145059.) by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other)(Evans, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amy L. Dvorak ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145045.) by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other)(Evans, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Grotefeld ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4145031.) by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other)(Evans, Matthew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America on November 27, 2019 (Evans, Matthew) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (ABF).
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to United States of America through the U.S. Attorney(ABF)
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,,, Summons to USA to be issued (Evans, Matthew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/20/19. (ABF)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/20/19. (ABF)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/20/19. (ABF)
November 20, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to United States of America.. (ABF)
November 20, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
November 19, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Illinois National Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Granite State Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Philadelphia Indemnity Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Country Casualty Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Cincinnati Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Corporate Interest by General Insurance Company of America. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by First National Insurance Company of America. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco National Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lexington Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Indemnity Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,,, Exhibits 8, 9, 10 and 11 by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,,, Exhibits 4, 5, 6 and 7 by AIG Property Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, General Insurance Company of America, Granite State Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, State Farm Indemnity Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7)(Evans, Matthew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4135117.), filed by General Insurance Company of America, Illinois National Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Indemnity Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company, Safeco National Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company, State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America, Philadelphia Indemnity Company, Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Evans, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. United States of America (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Indemnity Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois National Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Indemnity Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco National Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Represented By: Michael A Johnson
Represented By: Mark L McGuire
Represented By: Mark S Grotefeld
Represented By: Amy Dvorak
Represented By: Emma L Gaddipati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?