Turner v. LHC Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lynda Turner
Defendant: LHC Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00511
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties have filed a Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting [Doc. 12]. Therefore, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Wednesday, February 19, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. EST. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate a conference call with counsel for Defendant after which all participating counsel shall call chambers at (423) 787-7400 at the appointed time. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 02/07/2020. (CAT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cramer, Alexander)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by LHC Group, Inc. (Edwards, Heath)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by LHC Group, Inc.. (Edwards, Heath)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/09/2020. (AMP)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer by LHC Group, Inc..(Edwards, Heath)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynda Turner. LHC Group, Inc. served on 12/16/2019. (Nelson, Jesse)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/13/19. (ABF)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/13/19. (ABF)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 12/13/19. (ABF)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LHC Group, Inc.. (ABF)
December 13, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LHC Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4158921.), filed by Lynda Turner. (Attachments: #1 Summons - LHC, #2 Other - Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. LHC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHC Group, Inc.
Represented By: Heath Hamilton Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Turner
Represented By: Jesse D Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?