Schilke et al v. First National Bank of Oneida et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Benton Lawson, Richard Schilke, Annette Lawson and Pamela Schilke
Defendant: Mark Kline, James L. Cotton, Jr., Allyn M. Lay, Jr., William H. Stover, Rhonda Longmire, John Does and First National Bank of Oneida
Case Number: 3:2019cv00528
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 FNB Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pamela Schilke, Richard Schilke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (AYB)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Irina Warchol on behalf of James L. Cotton, Jr(Official capacity as Officer of First National Bank), James L. Cotton, Jr(individually), John Does, First National Bank of Oneida, Mark Kline(individually), Mark Kline(Official capacity as President and CEO of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(Official capacity as Trustee of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(individually), Rhonda Longmire (Warchol, Samantha)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne A Ritchie, II on behalf of James L. Cotton, Jr(Official capacity as Officer of First National Bank), James L. Cotton, Jr(individually), John Does, First National Bank of Oneida, Mark Kline(individually), Mark Kline(Official capacity as President and CEO of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(Official capacity as Trustee of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(individually), Rhonda Longmire (Ritchie, Wayne)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James L. Cotton, Jr(Official capacity as Officer of First National Bank), James L. Cotton, Jr(individually), John Does, First National Bank of Oneida, Mark Kline(individually), Mark Kline(Official capacity as President and CEO of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(Official capacity as Trustee of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(individually), Rhonda Longmire. (Stovall, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by James L. Cotton, Jr(Official capacity as Officer of First National Bank), James L. Cotton, Jr(individually), John Does, First National Bank of Oneida, Mark Kline(individually), Mark Kline(Official capacity as President and CEO of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(Official capacity as Trustee of First National Bank), Allyn M. Lay, Jr(individually), Rhonda Longmire. (Stovall, James)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to James L. Cotton, Jr, First National Bank of Oneida, Mark Kline, Rhonda Longmire, and William H. Stover and returned to plaintiff for service. (AYB)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on December 30, 2019. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiffs) (AYB)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on December 30, 2019. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiffs) (AYB)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on December 30, 2019. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiffs) (AYB)
December 30, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Defendants (AYB)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400: K3039458) filed by Pamela Schilke, Richard Schilke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (AYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schilke et al v. First National Bank of Oneida et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benton Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Schilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kline
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Cotton, Jr.
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyn M. Lay, Jr.
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Longmire
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Oneida
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?