Rowland v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Austin Rowland
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00530
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Baker, John)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on CSX Transportation, Inc. on 01/10/2020, filed by Austin Rowland. (Anderson, Claude)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (KMK)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company., filed by Austin Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Other civil cover sheet)(Anderson, Claude)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/2/20. (JBR)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/2/20. (JBR)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/2/20. (JBR)
January 2, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (JBR)
January 2, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4176282.), filed by Austin Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Claude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Rowland
Represented By: Claude W. Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?