Masters v. Republic Finance et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Allison Masters
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Republic Finance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00050
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allison Masters. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 2/12/2020. (Swan, Philip)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 3/4/2020. (BRF)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION filed by Republic Finance. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine Sumner)(Anthony, Ariel)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION by Republic Finance. (Anthony, Ariel)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Yoakum, Brian)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L Yoakum on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Yoakum, Brian)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel Mechelle Anthony on behalf of Republic Finance (Anthony, Ariel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint & Exhibits (Received Feb 11, 2020 at 10:03am CST) served on Republic Finance Cynthia Leblanc, COMPANY: 7031 Commerce Circle, Baton Rouge, La 70809 on Feb 11, 2020, 2:40 pm CST, filed by Allison Masters. (Swan, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allison Masters. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/11/2020 (Swan, Philip) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (KMK).
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint & Exhibits (Received Feb 11, 2020 at 10:03am CST) served on Republic Finance Cynthia Leblanc, COMPANY: 7031 Commerce Circle, Baton Rouge, La 70809 on Feb 11, 2020, 2:40 pm CST, filed by Allison Masters. (Swan, Philip)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/5/20. (ABF)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/5/20. (ABF)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/5/20. (ABF)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Republic Finance. (Attachments: #1 Summons Equifax Information Services)(ABF)
February 5, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4221928.), filed by Allison Masters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Other, #7 Other, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Swan, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masters v. Republic Finance et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Brian L Yoakum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Finance
Represented By: Ariel Mechelle Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Masters
Represented By: Philip Gordon Swan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?