Jett v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Jett
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00056
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), National Association. (Fraioli, Marielise)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Capital One Bank SHALL file its response to the Complaint on or before April 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 3/10/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 3/12/2020 to indicate c/m to Marielise Fraioli (ABF).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 3/10/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 3/12/2020 to indicate c/m to Marielise Fraioli (ABF).
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Capital One by Bobby Jett. (Swan, Philip)
March 10, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association (JBR)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3039925) by Capital One Bank (USA), National Association. (JBR)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Polly, Erin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Polly, Erin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Polly, Erin)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Capital One Bank (USA) SHALL have an additional seven days to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 2/28/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Capital One by Bobby Jett. (Swan, Philip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Bobby Jett Experian Information Solutions Inc. served on 2/11/2020 (Swan, Philip) Modified text on 2/13/2020 (KMK).
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed CAPITAL ONE Acknowledgement filed by Bobby Jett., (Swan, Philip) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (KMK).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 02/07/2020. (CAT)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 02/07/2020. (CAT)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 02/07/2020. (CAT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : For future reference, please file the Civil Cover sheet and Summons in a non-fillable form, also please be sure to date the Civil Cover Sheet. (CAT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), National Association, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (CAT)
February 7, 2020 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4224449.), filed by Bobby Jett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Other)(Swan, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jett v. Capital One Bank (USA), National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), National Association
Represented By: Marielise Fraioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jett
Represented By: Philip Gordon Swan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?