Gorghis et al v. City of Knoxville, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: John Gorghis and Kelli Gorghis
Defendant: City of Knoxville, Tennessee, Preston Tucker, Jason Kalmenek, Matthew Speiser and Jason Kalmanek
Case Number: 3:2020cv00247
Filed: June 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by City of Knoxville, Tennessee.(Mills, Ronald)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Mills, Ronald)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jason Kalmanek(individually), Jason Kalmanek(in his official capacity), Matthew Speiser(individually), Matthew Speiser(in his official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Summons Jason Kalmanek)(JCK)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Kelli Gorghis, John Gorghis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Looper, Patrick)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (JCK)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/8/2020. (JCK)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/8/2020. (JCK)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/8/2020. (JCK)
June 8, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to City of Knoxville, Tennessee, Jason Kalmenek(in his official capacity), Jason Kalmenek(individually), Matthew Speiser(individually), Matthew Speiser(in his official capacity). Summons were received for Jason Kalmanek and Matthew Speicer, but parties listed on the complaint are Jason Kalmenek and Matthew Speiser (JCK)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Preston Tucker(in his official capacity), Preston Tucker(individually). (JCK)
June 8, 2020 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
June 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4366853.), filed by John Gorghis, Kelli Gorghis. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Looper, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorghis et al v. City of Knoxville, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Knoxville, Tennessee
Represented By: Ronald E Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kalmenek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Speiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kalmanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gorghis
Represented By: Patrick L Looper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Gorghis
Represented By: Patrick L Looper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?