Pridemore-Turner v. University Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carol Pridemore-Turner
Defendant: University Health System, Inc. and James Martin McLoughlin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00318
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by University Health System, Inc. of Service of Rule 26(A)(1)(a) Initial Disclosures (Thompson, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The parties have filed a Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting [Doc. 18]. Therefore, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Thursday, September 17, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. EST. The parties shall call the Courts conference line at 866-390-1828 and enter access code 4845352 at the appointed time.. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/4/2020. (JCK)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by James Martin McLoughlin of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Fair, Jacob)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Carol Pridemore-Turner of Service of her Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Mitchell, Grant)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mitchell, Grant)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Carol Pridemore-Turner (Mitchell, Grant)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by University Health System, Inc.. (Thompson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 08/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James Martin McLoughlin.(Fair, Jacob)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by University Health System, Inc..(Thompson, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Spencer Fair on behalf of James Martin McLoughlin (Fair, Jacob)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on University Health System, Inc. on 7/23/20, filed by Carol Pridemore-Turner. (Mitchell, Grant)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civl Action served on James Martin McLoughlin, MD on 7/24/20, filed by Carol Pridemore-Turner. (Mitchell, Grant)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Thompson and Stephen C. Daves on behalf of University Health System, Inc. (Thompson, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (AYB).
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to James Martin McLoughlin and University Health System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons McLoughlin) (AYB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Carol Pridemore-Turner re #1 Complaint, Summons to University Health System, Inc. (Mitchell, Grant)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Carol Pridemore-Turner re #1 Complaint, Summons to James Martin McLoughlin, MD (Mitchell, Grant)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 7/20/2020. (JCK)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 7/20/2020. (JCK)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 7/20/2020. (JCK)
July 20, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to James Martin McLoughlin, University Health System, Inc. (JCK)
July 20, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JCK)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Martin McLoughlin, University Health System, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4417277.), filed by Carol Pridemore-Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Linda Quinton, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Faith, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pridemore-Turner v. University Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: Stephen C Daves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Martin McLoughlin
Represented By: James H. London
Represented By: Jacob Spencer Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Pridemore-Turner
Represented By: Grant E Mitchell
Represented By: Weldon E Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?