Losh et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Linda S. Losh and Robert L. Losh
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Linda S Losh, Wyndham Rewards, Inc., Tami McMahan, Jason Smith, Jason Roy Smith, Eric McKinley and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2020cv00339
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT of Mediation (Holloway, Dana)
June 15, 2021 the parties have not been able to have a mediation within the time period ordered by the Court [Doc. 18]. Therefore, the parties shall have up to and including Thursday, August 19, 2021, in which to engage in mediation. The parties must file a joint status report on or before August 19, 2021, to apprise the Court of whether their resolution efforts were successful, whether they require additional time to negotiate, or whether the parties wish to proceed to trial. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, this case shall remain STAYED. (JAN)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to mediate in good faith within ninety (90) days. Within seven (7) days following the conclusion of mediation, the mediator shall FILE a report with the Court stating the outcome of the mediation, as contemplated by Local Rule 16.4(m). In light of the order of mediation, this action is STAYED. If the parties are unable to resolve this action pursuant to mediation, the Court will lift the stay after the mediator files his or her report stating the outcome of the mediation. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 5, 2021. (AYB)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wyndham Rewards, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Wyndham Rewards, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-TN SOS Filings)(Strittmatter, Ashley)
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wyndham Rewards, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. Regarding Meet and Confer (Strittmatter, Ashley)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Wyndham Rewards, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Wyndham Rewards, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.)(JBR)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Linda S. Losh, Robert L. Losh. (Rieger, George)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Linda S. Losh, Robert L. Losh. (Rieger, George)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Linda S. Losh, Robert L. Losh. (Rieger, George)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to show cause within ten (10) days of the entry of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/7/20. (ABF)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on September 1, 2020. (AYB)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on September 1, 2020. (AYB)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on September 1, 2020. (AYB)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Edna Allen, et al., v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., No. 3:18-CV-259. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on September 1, 2020. (AYB)
September 1, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AYB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please complete the Summons for Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., and Wyndham Rewards, Inc., by providing the attorney information in the designated section in the Summons and refile them in a non-fillable form using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it to the Complaint. Requirements due by 8/10/2020. (AMP)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Linda S. Losh, Robert L. Losh. (Rieger, George)
August 5, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to John Does 1-100, Eric McKinley, Tami McMahan, Jason Roy Smith. (AMP)
August 5, 2020 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Poplin for related case determination. (AMP)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Robert L. Losh. (Rieger, George)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4435450.), filed by Robert L. Losh, Linda S. Losh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Rieger, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Losh et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Represented By: Ashley M Strittmatter
Represented By: Jamie Ballinger Holden
Represented By: Sye Thomas Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda S Losh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Rewards, Inc.
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Represented By: Ashley M Strittmatter
Represented By: Jamie Ballinger Holden
Represented By: Sye Thomas Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Roy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Losh
Represented By: George H Rieger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Losh
Represented By: George H Rieger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?