Romine et al v. Motte et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Romine and Christina Romine
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development and Janet Motte
Case Number: 3:2020cv00364
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development served on 10/5/2020. (JBR)
October 1, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Romine, Christina Romine. Janet Motte served on 9/29/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Romine, Christina Romine. U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development through the US Attorney served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal Case by Janet Motte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Permission to file)(Feeney, John)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/4/2021 09:00 AM in Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 03:00 PM in Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Motions due by 6/21/2021.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/16/20. Serviced via US Mail to Andrew and Christina Romine.(KFB).
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST Status Report and MOTION to Show Cause by Andrew Romine. (JBR)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #16 Answer to Complaint filed by Janet Motte. (JBR)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/14/20. (c/m to Andrew and Christina Romine, 723 Hillview Ln, Apt 71, Jefferson City, TN 37760) (ABF)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Janet Motte.(Feeney, John)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. 5 ) is hereby DENIED and the hearing on that motion is hereby CANCELLED. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a status report on or before October 2, 2020, advising the Court as to the state of the administrative grievance proceedings. If, at a later time, Plaintiffs anticipate that Defendant Motte might fail to act in accordance with her representations to this Court, Plaintiffs may pursue relief as appropriate at that time. In all other respects, this case shall proceed as normal.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/3/2020. (BJL)*Mailed to Andrew Romine and Mailed to Christina Romine
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Janet Motte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: HUD Eviction Moratorium)(Feeney, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Janet Motte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eviction Moratorium)(Feeney, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Janet Motte, U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development c/o Ben Carson & USAO). (forwarded to USM for service) (ADA)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of submission of service packets per #6 by Andrew Romine and Christina Romine (ADA)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Janet Motte re #8 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (CNC)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing RESET as a video conference hearing for 9/3/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/31/2020. (AML) Order served to US Attorney and mailed to Janet Motte
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on August 24, 2020. (SAC)Order mailed to Andrew and Christina Romine and Janet Motte.
August 21, 2020 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Janet Motte or U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development. (AYB)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re IFP Service (Pro Se) (AYB)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear his/her own costs. Plaintiff is hereby put ON NOTICE that failure to serve the defendant(s) in the time required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on August 21, 2020. (copy mailed to the pro se plaintiffs c/o 723 Hillview Ln, Apt 71, Jefferson City, TN 37760 with 4 blank summons forms and 4 USM 285 forms) (AYB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction requested in Complaint #1 by Andrew Romine and Christina Romine. (ADA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Andrew and Christine Romine, 723 Hillview Ln Apt 71 Jefferson City, TN 37760) (JBR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew Romine, Christina Romine. (JBR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Romine, Christina Romine. (JBR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janet Motte, U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development, filed by Andrew Romine, Christina Romine.(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romine et al v. Motte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Romine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Romine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Motte
Represented By: John T Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?