Pheap v. City of Knoxville, et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Sophea Pheap and Sophia Pheap
Defendant: Eve M Thomas, Dylan M Williams, John & Jane Does 1-5, City of Knoxville, Tennessee, Eve M. Thomas, Dylan M. Williams and City of Knoxville
Case Number: 3:2020cv00387
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dylan M. Williams. (Melson, E)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Dylan M. Williams Pursuant to Order Governing Motions to Dismiss [Doc. 6] (Melson, E)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dylan M. Williams. (Melson, E)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas.(Mills, Ronald)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas (Mills, Ronald)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. Dylan M. Williams served on 9/30/2020. (Baker, Lance)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. City of Knoxville served on 9/18/2020. (Baker, Lance)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Pheap. Eve M. Thomas served on 9/18/2020. (Baker, Lance)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: this case is reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/15/2020. (BJL)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/20. (JBR)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/27/2020. (CAT)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/27/2020. (CAT)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/27/2020. (CAT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Knoxville, Eve M. Thomas, Dylan M. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons Eve M. Thomas, #2 Summons Dylan M. Williams) (CAT)
August 27, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Knoxville, Tennessee, John & Jane Does 1-5, Eve M Thomas, Dylan M Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4461214.), filed by Sophea Pheap. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons City of Knoxville, #3 Summons Thomas, #4 Summons Williams)(Baker, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pheap v. City of Knoxville, et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Knoxville, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve M. Thomas
Represented By: Ronald E Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan M. Williams
Represented By: E Jerome Melson
Represented By: John M Kizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Knoxville
Represented By: Ronald E Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophea Pheap
Represented By: Lance Kristopher Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Pheap
Represented By: Lance Kristopher Baker
Represented By: Joshua D Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?