Maurer v. Lincoln Memorial University et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Charles Maurer
Defendant: Samantha Hardin, Jason Kishpaugh, April James, Spencer Anderson, Dr. Dan Graves, Dean Matthew Lyon, Lincoln Memorial University, Dean Russell Gordon, Professor Vonda Laughlin, Professor Arlene Amarante, Evan Wright, Thatcher Smith, Dr. Clayton Hess, Dean William Gill and Lincoln Memorial University Duncan School of Law
Case Number: 3:2020cv00395
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
2 Judge: Christopher H Steger
3 Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 31 Brief in Opposition to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles Maurer. (JBR)
October 20, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Evan Wright. (JBR)
October 19, 2020 Filing 29 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lincoln Memorial University. (Coates, J.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Arlene Amarante, Spencer Anderson, Russell Gordon, Dan Graves, Samantha Hardin, April James, Jason Kishpaugh, Vonda Laughlin, Lincoln Memorial University, Lincoln Memorial University Duncan School of Law, Matthew Lyon, Thatcher Smith. (Coates, J.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Arlene Amarante, Spencer Anderson, Russell Gordon, Dan Graves, Samantha Hardin, April James, Jason Kishpaugh, Vonda Laughlin, Lincoln Memorial University, Lincoln Memorial University Duncan School of Law, Matthew Lyon, Thatcher Smith. (Coates, J.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Charles Maurer as to William Gill. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Vonda Laughlin served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Thatcher Smith served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Spencer Anderson served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Samantha Hardin served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Matthew Lyon served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Lincoln Memorial University Duncan School of Law served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Lincoln Memorial University served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Jason Kishpaugh served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Russell Gordon served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Dan Graves served on 9/26/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. Arlene Amarante served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Maurer. April James served on 9/28/2020. (ABF)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Clayton Hess. (JBR)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to E-File by Charles Maurer. (JBR)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Co-Counsel of Choice by Charles Maurer. (JBR)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 6 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/16/20. Serviced via US Mail to Charles Maurer. (KFB)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Travis R. McDonough, United States District Judge, and to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge, for all further proceedings. ( Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton and District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case.) Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/15/2020. (BJL) Modified on 9/15/2020 (BJL).*Mailed to Charles Maurer
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/11/20. (copy mailed to Charles Maurer, 1712 Ramsay Street, Alcoa, TN 37701) (JBR)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/11/20. (JBR) (copy mailed to Charles Maurer, 1712 Ramsay Street, Alcoa, TN 37701) Modified text on 9/11/2020 (JBR).
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arlene Amarante, Spencer Anderson, William Gill, Russell Gordon, Dan Graves, Samantha Hardin, April James, Jason Kishpaugh, Vonda Laughlin, Lincoln Memorial University, Lincoln Memorial University Duncan School of Law, Matthew Lyon, Thatcher Smith, Evan Wright. (Summons mailed to Charles Maurer, 1712 Ramsay Street, Alcoa, TN 37701) (JBR) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (JBR).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/8/20. (copy mailed to Charles Maurer, 1712 Ramsay Street, Alcoa, TN 37701) (JBR)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Charles Maurer) (JBR)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Maurer. (JBR)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Maurer. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maurer v. Lincoln Memorial University et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Hardin
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kishpaugh
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April James
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Anderson
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dan Graves
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Matthew Lyon
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Memorial University
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Russell Gordon
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professor Vonda Laughlin
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professor Arlene Amarante
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thatcher Smith
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Clayton Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean William Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Memorial University Duncan School of Law
Represented By: J. Keith Coates, Jr.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Hutcherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?