SNMP Research, Inc. et al v. Broadcom Inc. et al (JRG2)
Plaintiff: SNMP Research, Inc. and SNMP Research International, Inc.
Defendant: Broadcom Inc., Extreme Networks, Inc. and Brocade Communications Systems LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00451
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 45 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Extreme Networks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Neukom, John)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
December 23, 2020 Filing 43 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Plessman, Alison)
December 22, 2020 Filing 42 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC . (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Plessman, Alison)
December 22, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Plessman, Alison)
December 22, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Memorandum of Facts and Law (Redacted), #2 Other Declaration of Mark Brazeal (Redacted), #3 Other Exh A To Declaration of Mark Brazeal (Public Version), #4 Other Declaration of John Rondoni, #5 Other Proposed Order)(Plessman, Alison)
December 22, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Change Venue filed by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Neukom, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Change Venue by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Lam)(Neukom, John)
December 10, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by John Neukom on behalf of Extreme Networks, Inc. (Neukom, John)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/4/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 12/7/2020 to indicate c/m to John Neukom, Skadden Arps, 525 University Avenue, Palo Alto, CA 94301 (ABF).
December 4, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Extreme Networks, Inc. (ABF)
December 4, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 PAID, Receipt #K3041542.) by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (ABF)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 22, 2020, and Plaintiffs SHALL respond to any motions filed by Defendants as responsive pleadings on or before January 26, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/3/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
December 2, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Plessman, Alison)
November 30, 2020 Filing 32 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jordan Feirman re 29 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ABF)
November 17, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (Feirman, Jordan)
November 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan A Feirman on behalf of Extreme Networks, Inc. (Feirman, Jordan)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/17/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.)(CWS)
November 16, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Extreme Networks, Inc. (ABF)
November 16, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3041440.) by Extreme Networks, Inc.. (ABF)
November 9, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by not more than 21 days (L.R. 12.1) by Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Plessman, Alison)
November 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore Umberto Bonaccorso on behalf of Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC (Bonaccorso, Salvatore)
November 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eunice Leong on behalf of Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC (Leong, Eunice)
November 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Plessman on behalf of Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC (Plessman, Alison)
November 6, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Morgan Chu ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4544097.) filed by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc. (ABF)
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Morgan Chu ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4544097.) by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rice, Cheryl)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 11/2/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (JTS)
October 30, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Broadcom Inc., #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Broadcom Inc., #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Broadcom Inc. . (AMP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. Receipt No. G2012714) by Broadcom Inc. (AMP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. Receipt No. G2012713) by Broadcom Inc. (AMP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. Receipt No. G2012708) by Broadcom Inc. (AMP)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding TXu 1-706-718; TXu 1-772-248, TXu 1-772-250, TXu 1-738-936, TX 1-707-158, TXu 1-738-954, TXu 1-707-157, TXu 1-738-958 . (Rice, Cheryl)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SNMP Research, Inc., SNMP Research International, Inc.. Extreme Networks, Inc. served on 10/27/2020. (Nasrollahi, Rameen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SNMP Research, Inc., SNMP Research International, Inc.. Brocade Communications Systems LLC served on 10/27/2020. (Nasrollahi, Rameen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SNMP Research, Inc., SNMP Research International, Inc.. Broadcom Inc. served on 10/27/2020. (Nasrollahi, Rameen)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/27/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS) Modified on 10/27/2020 to indicate c/m to David Nimmer, Irell & Manella, L.L.P., 1800 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 900, Century City, Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276 (ABF).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/27/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS) Modified on 10/27/2020 to indicate c/m to Olivia Weber, Irell & Manella, L.L.P., 1800 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 900, Century City, Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276(ABF).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/27/20. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (CWS) Modified on 10/27/2020 to indicate c/m to Matt Ashley, Irell & Manella, L.L.P., 1800 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 900, Century City, Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276) (ABF).
October 26, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear of David Nimmer MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4531577.) filed by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc., #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Olivia L. Weber ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4531603.) filed by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc., #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of A. Matthew Ashley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4531568.) filed by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc. (JBR)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/26/20. (JBR)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/26/20. (JBR)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/26/20. (JBR)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Broadcom Inc., Brocade Communications Systems LLC, Extreme Networks, Inc. (JBR)
October 26, 2020 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Olivia L. Weber ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4531603.) by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Rice, Cheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear of David Nimmer, MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4531577.) by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Rice, Cheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of A. Matthew Ashley ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4531568.) by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rice, Cheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc.. (Rice, Cheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc. Collective Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Other Complaint, without redaction)(Rice, Cheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by SNMP Research International, Inc., SNMP Research, Inc.. (Rice, Cheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4531460.), filed by SNMP Research, Inc., SNMP Research International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Broadcom Inc., #3 Summons Brocade Communications Systems LLC, #4 Summons Extreme Networks, Inc., #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B)(Rice, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNMP Research, Inc. et al v. Broadcom Inc. et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcom Inc.
Represented By: Salvatore Umberto Bonaccorso
Represented By: Eunice Leong
Represented By: Alison Plessman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extreme Networks, Inc.
Represented By: John Neukom
Represented By: Jordan A Feirman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems LLC
Represented By: Salvatore Umberto Bonaccorso
Represented By: Eunice Leong
Represented By: Alison Plessman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNMP Research, Inc.
Represented By: Matt Ashley
Represented By: David Nimmer
Represented By: Rameen J Nasrollahi
Represented By: Olivia Weber
Represented By: Cheryl G Rice
Represented By: John L Wood
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Alvin Matthew Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNMP Research International, Inc.
Represented By: Matt Ashley
Represented By: David Nimmer
Represented By: Rameen J Nasrollahi
Represented By: Olivia Weber
Represented By: Cheryl G Rice
Represented By: John L Wood
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Alvin Matthew Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?