Todd et al v. NIBCO Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Todd and Richard Todd
Defendant: NIBCO Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00505
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) on or before February 22, 2021. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/22/2021. (AWS)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Arthur Edge and David Horsley are hereby RELIEVED of their obligations in this matter. Further, given that Attorneys Arthur Edge and David Horsley have withdrawn from this case, the Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 1/21/21. (ABF)
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Deborah Todd, Richard Todd Case Reported Settled By Darius A. Crayton, Esq.; Parties participated in mediation/arbitration. (Day, Justin)
January 20, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER by Deborah Todd, Richard Todd. (Day, Justin)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Travis R McDonough no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Charles Edward Atchley, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on January 5, 2021. (SAC) Modified on 1/5/2021, Order mailed to Horsley, Edge, Lawrence and Crayton. (SAC).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Attorneys H. Arthur Edge, III, and David Horsley are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before January 19, 2021, as to why they should not be removed as attorneys of record in this case and why other appropriate sanctions should not issue for their failure to comply with the Notices. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause to Attorneys Edge and Horsley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on January 5, 2021. (AYB)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/17/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copies mailed to Attorneys Crayton, Horsley, Edge and Lawrence on 12/17/2020 (JBR).
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of KIRBY D. FARRIS ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4586146.) by Deborah Todd, Richard Todd. (Day, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of JOHN DAVID LAWRENCE ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4586137.) by Deborah Todd, Richard Todd. (Day, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Darius Crayton ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4585593.) by Deborah Todd, Richard Todd. (Day, Justin)
December 11, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Darius Crayton ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4585593.) filed by Richard Todd, Deborah Todd (JBR)
December 11, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of JOHN DAVID LAWRENCE ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4586137.) filed by Richard Todd, Deborah Todd, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of KIRBY D. FARRIS ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4586146.) filed by Richard Todd, Deborah Todd (JBR)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Agreed Order Extending Pleading Deadlines re: #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/03/2020. (KMK) Modified on 12/3/2020 (KMK): copies mailed to Darius Crayton, David Horsley, H. Arthur Edge and John Lawrence.
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend and Respond to Amended Complaint by NIBCO Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Farringer, John)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY*** Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal, :PDF is interactive, Please make sure to flatten all documents. (BDG)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, Darius A Crayton, is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Darius Crayton.
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, David Horsley, is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Horsley.
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney H. Arthur Edge, is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Edge.
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, John Lawrence, is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Lawrence.
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/30/2020. (BDG)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/30/2020. (BDG)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/30/2020. (BDG)
November 30, 2020 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BDG)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by NIBCO Inc.. (Farringer, John)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Knox County, Tennessee, case number 1-326-20. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4568518), filed by NIBCO Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Farringer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd et al v. NIBCO Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIBCO Inc.
Represented By: John L Farringer, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Todd
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Represented By: John D Lawrence
Represented By: Kirby Farris
Represented By: Darius A Crayton
Represented By: David Horsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Todd
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Represented By: John D Lawrence
Represented By: Kirby Farris
Represented By: Darius A Crayton
Represented By: David Horsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?