Doe v. Lee et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: William Byron Lee and David B. Rausch
Case Number: 3:2021cv00010
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Jones, Miranda)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by William Byron Lee, David B. Rausch. (Jones, Miranda)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 2/17/21. (ABF)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. William Byron Lee served on 1/15/2021; David B. Rausch served on 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Return of Service on David B. Rausch)(Little, Joseph)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Nicole Orr on behalf of All Defendants (Orr, Courtney)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Defendants SHALL file their response to the Complaint on or before March 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 1/22/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by William Byron Lee, David B. Rausch. (Jones, Miranda)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/13/21. (ABF)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/13/21. (ABF)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/13/21. (ABF)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Byron Lee, David B. Rausch. (Attachments: #1 Summons David Rausch)(ABF)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION for Protective Order and to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Little, Joseph)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order and to Proceed Under Pseudonym by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Protective Order)(Little, Joseph)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against William Byron Lee and David B Rausch ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4620985.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Gov. William Byron Lee, #3 Summons Summons to David Rausch)(Little, Joseph) Modified text on 1/13/2021 (ABF).
January 13, 2021 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lee et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Little, IV
Represented By: Zachary Carter Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Byron Lee
Represented By: Miranda Jones
Represented By: Courtney Nicole Orr
Represented By: Mallory Kathryn Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Rausch
Represented By: Miranda Jones
Represented By: Courtney Nicole Orr
Represented By: Mallory Kathryn Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?