Fortener v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Azure Sky Fortener
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00201
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (JBR)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/21/21. (JBR)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/17/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
June 4, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4752507.) filed by Azure Sky Fortener (ABF)
June 4, 2021 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4752507.) by Azure Sky Fortener. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa) Modified on 6/4/2021; Certificate is more than 30 days old but the Clerk's Office has confirmed with the Northern District of NY and attorney is still in good standing. (ABF).
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Azure Sky Fortener. (Palmer, Melissa)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Azure Sky Fortener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortener v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azure Sky Fortener
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?