Hutchison v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Alicia Dawn Hutchison
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00211
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 7/30/2021, Office of Regional Counsel on 7/30/2021, Attorney General on 8/2/2021, filed by Alicia Dawn Hutchison. (Palmer, Melissa)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) (KMK)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Other Summons, #2 Other Summons)(KMK)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/22/2021. (KMK)
June 11, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #4 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Alicia Dawn Hutchison (JBR)
June 11, 2021 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4758873.) (Correction: Wrong Document Filed in Dkt #3) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa) Modified event on 6/11/2021 (JBR).
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 [WRONG PDF FILED. RE-FILED AS DOC. #4 ] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4758873.) by Alicia Dawn Hutchison. (Palmer, Melissa) Modified text on 6/11/2021 (JBR).
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alicia Dawn Hutchison. (Palmer, Melissa)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Alicia Dawn Hutchison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchison v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Dawn Hutchison
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?