McKendrick v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Michael L. McKendrick
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, Attorney General and U.S. Attorney, Eastern District of Tennessee
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00224
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael L. McKendrick. U.S. Attorney, Eastern District of Tennessee served on 6/30/2021. (Morgan, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael L. McKendrick. Attorney General served on 7/6/2021. (Morgan, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KMK)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Michael L. McKendrick. Amendment to #1 Complaint - SSA, #4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac), #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) . (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Morgan, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA and #3 Amended Document : requirements due by 6/28/2021. Counsel is directed to submit separate summonses for the US Attorney's Office, U.S. Attorney General and the Social Security Administration. The summons form can be found at: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/summons-civil-action-ao-440(KMK)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Michael L. McKendrick. Amendment to #1 Complaint - SSA, #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Amended Summons. (Morgan, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA, : requirements due by 6/24/2021. (KFB)
June 21, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (KFB)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT Michael L. McKendrick against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4766471.), filed by Michael L. McKendrick. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Process Receipt and Return, #3 Summons Summons)(Morgan, John) Modified on 6/22/2021 (KFB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKendrick v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. McKendrick
Represented By: John H Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney, Eastern District of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?