Allvin v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Kaela Louise Allvin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00269
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 9/16/2021, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 9/17/2021, and United States Attorney General on 9/20/2021, filed by Kaela Louise Allvin. (Palmer, Melissa)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) (ABF)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(ABF)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear his/her own costs. Plaintiff is hereby put ON NOTICE that failure to serve the defendant(s) in the time required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 8/13/21. (ABF)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/3/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
July 29, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4799749.) filed by Kaela Louise Allvin (AMP)
July 29, 2021 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4799749.) by Kaela Louise Allvin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kaela Louise Allvin. (Palmer, Melissa)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kaela Louise Allvin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allvin v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaela Louise Allvin
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?