Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency v. Team Health Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency
Defendant: Team Health Holdings, Inc., AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC and ACS Primary Care Physicians Louisiana PC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00104
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 5/12/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 5/13/2022 to indicate c/m to Janet Varnell, Varnell and Warwick, P.A., 1101 E. Cumberland Ave., Suite 201H, #105, Tampa, FL 33602(ABF).
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Janet R. Varnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid: K3044749) by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. (AYB)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #22 MOTION for Janet Varnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice; certificate of good standing is outside the 30-day window of issuance, however a check of the Florida Bar Associate website notes Ms. Varnell is a member in good standing. (AYB)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC served on 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. ACS Primary Care Physicians Louisiana PC served on 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. AmeriTeam Services, LLC served on 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. Team Health Holdings, Inc. served on 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Returned Green Card from Certified Mail)(Parker, Mary)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint by All Defendants. (Shockley, Gary)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C Shockley on behalf of ACS Primary Care Physicians Louisiana PC, AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc. (Shockley, Gary)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 4/14/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 4/8/2022 to note c/m Andrew A. Lemmon Lemmon Law Firm, LLC PO Box 904 Hahnville, LA 70057 and Janet Varnell Varnell and Warwick, P.A. 1101 E. Cumberland Ave. Suite 201H, #105 Tampa, FL 33602 (ADA).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency re #8 MOTION for Andrew Lemmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ABF) Modified on 4/14/2022 to indicate the Clerk's Office has verified that Mr. Lemmon is in good standing since the certificate is more than 30 days old (ABF).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Andrew Lemmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency (ABF)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 4/7/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 4/8/2022 to note c/m Andrew A. Lemmon Lemmon Law Firm, LLC PO Box 904 Hahnville, LA 70057 and Janet Varnell Varnell and Warwick, P.A. 1101 E. Cumberland Ave. Suite 201H, #105 Tampa, FL 33602 (ADA).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Mona Lisa Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3044545.) by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. (ABF)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for John S. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3044544.) by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. (ABF)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Mona Lisa Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency, #11 MOTION for John S. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency (ABF)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACS Primary Care Physicians Louisiana PC, AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.., filed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency.(Parker, Mary)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Andrew Lemmon re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) : The certificate of good standing does not have the Court seal. Please obtain a certificate of good standing from the Eastern District of LA with the court seal on it. (c/m to Andrew Lemmon) (ABF)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Andrew Lemmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3044507.) by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. (ABF)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on March 25, 2022. (AYB)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on March 25, 2022. (AYB)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on March 25, 2022. (AYB)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to United Health Care Services, Inc., et al. v. Team Health Holdings, Inc., et al., No. 3:21-CV-364. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Clifton L. Corker and Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook, this case also will be assigned to District Judge Clifton L. Corker and Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on March 25, 2022. (AYB)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order District Judge Clifton L Corker and US Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (AYB)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CNC)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorneys Wallace, Hughes, Varnell, and Lemmon. (CNC)Mailed to Varnell and Lemmon (CNC)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Case forwarded to Judge McCook's chambers for possible relation to case 3:21-cv-364. (CNC)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5011412.), filed by Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Summons - ACS, #3 Summons Summons - Ameriteam, #4 Summons Summons - HCFS, #5 Summons Summons - Team Health)(Parker, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency v. Team Health Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Risk Management Agency
Represented By: Andrew A. Lemmon
Represented By: Janet Varnell
Represented By: John S Hughes
Represented By: Mary A Parker
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Health Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Matthew S Mulqueen
Represented By: Nora Ann Koffman
Represented By: Walter Preston Battle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriTeam Services, LLC
Represented By: Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Matthew S Mulqueen
Represented By: Nora Ann Koffman
Represented By: Walter Preston Battle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS Primary Care Physicians Louisiana PC
Represented By: Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Matthew S Mulqueen
Represented By: Nora Ann Koffman
Represented By: Walter Preston Battle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?