Buncombe County, North Carolina v. Team Health Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BUNCOMBE COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA
Defendant: Team Health Holdings, Inc., AmeriTeam Services, LLC and HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00420
Filed: November 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
2 Judge: Jill E McCook
3 Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra. Poplin on 1/3/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5256870.) by Buncombe County, North Carolina. (Varnell, Janet) Modified on 12/28/2022 - The Certificate of Good Standing is more than 30 days old but the Clerk's Office has verified that the attorney is still in good standing (ABF).
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5256870.) filed by Buncombe County, North Carolina (ABF)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Docs. 12 and 13]. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/15/2022. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 12/16/2022 to note c/m Olivia Bridges Smith Wallace & Graham, P.A. 525 North Main Street Salisbury, NC 28144 and Robert N Hunter , Jr Higgins Benjamin, PLLC 301 N Elm Street Suite 800 Greensboro, NC 27401-2260 (ADA).
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert N. Hunter, Jr. (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #300000909) by Buncombe County, North Carolina. (JBR)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Olivia Bridges Smith (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #300000910) by Buncombe County, North Carolina. (JBR)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Buncombe County, North Carolina, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Buncombe County, North Carolina (JBR)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BUNCOMBE COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA. All Defendants. (Parker, Mary)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C Shockley on behalf of AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc. (Shockley, Gary)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Katherine A Crytzer no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/5/2022. (AWS)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/5/2022. (AWS)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 12/1/22. (ADA)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by BUNCOMBE COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA. (Parker, Mary)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/22/22. (ABF)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/22/22. (ABF)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/22/22. (ABF)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AmeriTeam Services, LLC, HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC, Team Health Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ameriteam Services LLC, #2 Summons HCFS Healthcare Financial Services)(ABF)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action Complaint) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5229674.), filed by BUNCOMBE COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Team Health Summons, #3 Summons Ameriteam Summons, #4 Summons HCFS Summons)(Parker, Mary)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buncombe County, North Carolina v. Team Health Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUNCOMBE COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Janet R Varnell
Represented By: John S Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Represented By: Mary A Parker
Represented By: Olivia Bridges Smith
Represented By: Robert N Hunter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Health Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Matthew S Mulqueen
Represented By: Nora Ann Koffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriTeam Services, LLC
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins
Represented By: Matthew S Mulqueen
Represented By: Nora Ann Koffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Caldwell Gwendolyn Collins
Represented By: Matthew S Mulqueen
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Nora Ann Koffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?