Runyon v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kaylee Runyon
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC and Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv00008
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kaylee Runyon (individually). (Rich, David) Modified on 2/2/2023 to note motion terminated. This is not a motion (AYB).
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 1/27/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 1/30/2023 to note copies mailed to Andrew Childers and James Douglas Jr. (AYB).
January 27, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #16 MOTION for James E. Douglas, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #17 MOTION for Andrew Childers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
January 26, 2023 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to #19 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), MDGA Certificate of Good Standing of Attorney James Douglas by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David)
January 26, 2023 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to #19 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), MDGA Certificate of Good Standing of Attorney Andrew Childers by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David)
January 25, 2023 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (ABF)
January 25, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to James E. Douglas, Jr. and C. Andrew Childers re: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Childers ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5278424.), #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James E. Douglas, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5278423.) : A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted (c/m to James E. Douglas, Jr. and C. Andrew Childers) (ABF)
January 24, 2023 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Mead Johnson Nutrition Summons Corrected by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David)
January 24, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Childers ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5278424.) by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David)
January 24, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James E. Douglas, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5278423.) by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David)
January 24, 2023 Filing 15 Administrative Notice to Counsel regarding #7 and #14 . Pursuant to the Administrative Notice to Counsel [Doc. 6], there continues to be no summons for Mead Johnson Nutrition Company for the Clerk's Office to issue. Multiple summons for Mead Johnson & Company, LLC [Doc. 7 and Doc. 14] have been submitted and issued. (AYB)
January 19, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1. (GRE) Modified on 1/19/2023. Copy of NEF mailed to Attorney C. Andrew Childers & James E. Douglas, Jr. (GRE).
January 17, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (ABF)
January 17, 2023 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Scanned Mead Johnson Nutrition Summons by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David)
January 12, 2023 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons for Mead Johnson Nutrition by Kaylee Runyon(individually). (Rich, David) Modified on 1/12/2023 to note .pdf is broken. Counsel has been advised and will resubmit this summons (AYB).
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/10/2023. (Copy of Order mailed to Attorneys James E. Douglas, Jr. and C. Andrew Childers). (LCK)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/10/2023. (Copy of order mailed to Attorney C. Andrew Childers & James E. Douglas, Jr.). (LCK)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 1/10/2023. (Copy mailed to Attorneys C. Andrew Childers and James E. Douglas, Jr.). (LCK) Modified to reflect copies mailed on 1/10/2023 (LCK).
January 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys C. Andrew Childers and James E. Douglas, Jr. are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Attorney C. Andrew Childers and James E. Douglas, Jr.). (LCK)
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (LCK)
January 10, 2023 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Supplement: Duplicate Summons received. Please refile Summons for Defendant "Mead Johnson Nutrition Company" using the event "Supplement" found under "Other Documents" and link back to Complaint. Requirements due by 1/17/2023. (LCK)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement. (LCK)
January 6, 2023 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (LCK)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet (Legible) by KAYLEE RUNYON. (Rich, David)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Defendants' Summons by KAYLEE RUNYON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Mead Johnson Nutrition Company)(Rich, David) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/10/2023) (LCK). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/10/2023) (LCK).
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet by KAYLEE RUNYON. (Rich, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/10/2023) (LCK).
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5263092.), filed by KAYLEE RUNYON.(Rich, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runyon v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylee Runyon
Represented By: C Andrew Childers
Represented By: James E Douglas, Jr
Represented By: David M Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?