Sun Properties, LLC v. Advance Stores Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sun Properties, LLC
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Inc., Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Jeffrey P Jones and Lisa Jones
Case Number: 3:2023cv00096
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company (Hunter, Seth)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 4/25/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Joel Isenberg on 4/25/2023 (JBR).
April 25, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company (JBR)
April 21, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Partial Claim of Sun Without Prejudice- Indemnification filed by Sun Properties, LLC. (Drinnon, S)
April 18, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean W Martin on behalf of Advance Stores Company, Inc. (Martin, Sean)
April 18, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel Isenberg (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #300001611) by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company. (JBR)
April 18, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Adopt #17 First MOTION to Remand filed by Sun Properties, LLC, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Sun Properties, LLC by Lisa Jones. (Talley, P)
April 14, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION to Remand by Sun Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other E-File Email)(Drinnon, S)
April 14, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss Partial Claim of Sun Without Prejudice- Indemnification filed by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A -AAIC Policy, #2 Exhibit Ex B -APCIC Policy)(Hunter, Seth)
April 7, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION Motion to Realign Jeffrey P. Jones and Lisa Jones as Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Realign and Response to Notice of Non-Consent filed by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 31, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION Motion to Realign Jeffrey P. Jones and Lisa Jones as Plaintiffs RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REALIGN PARTIES filed by Sun Properties, LLC. (Drinnon, S)
March 31, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Partial Claim of Sun Without Prejudice- Indemnification by Sun Properties, LLC. (Drinnon, S)
March 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Lisa Jones of Non Consent to Removal (Talley, P)
March 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by P Richard Talley on behalf of Lisa Jones (Talley, P)
March 17, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Citizenship by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 17, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Citizenship by Ace American Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/17/2023. (JCK)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/17/2023. (JCK)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/17/2023. (JCK)
March 17, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company. (JCK)
March 17, 2023 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (JCK)
March 16, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION Motion to Realign Jeffrey P. Jones and Lisa Jones as Plaintiffs by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 16, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 16, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ace American Insurance Company. (Hunter, Seth)
March 16, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company.(Hunter, Seth)
March 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-27531. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5324454), filed by Ace American Insurance Company, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Properties, LLC v. Advance Stores Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Properties, LLC
Represented By: S Douglas Drinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Tyler Hunter
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Tyler Hunter
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P Jones
Represented By: P Richard Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jones
Represented By: P Richard Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?