Mitchell et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Co
Plaintiff: John C. Mitchell and Bonnie W. Mitchell
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2023cv00140
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines #18 is GRANTED and this action is STAYED until further Order of the Court. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within 90 days of the date of this Order. The parties are FURTHER ORDERED to notify the Court within 5 days of any settlement of this matter. The scheduling conference presently set for June 8, 2023, is CANCELED and will be reset as necessary. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 6/5/2023. (AWS)
June 1, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Extend All Deadlines by Bonnie W. Mitchell, John C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Buckley, William)
May 31, 2023 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buckley, William)
May 26, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Co.(Headrick, Daniel)
May 16, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Nicholas A Black terminated. (ABF)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..On or before June 1, 2023, the parties shallfile a report outlining their discovery plan. The report must comply in all respects withRule 26(f)(3).Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/15/2023. (DJH)
May 10, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Bonnie W. Mitchell, John C. Mitchell (Buckley, William)
May 10, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Co., filed by Bonnie W. Mitchell, John C. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-- Policy)(Buckley, William)
May 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William D Buckley, III on behalf of Bonnie W. Mitchell, John C. Mitchell (Buckley, William)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/25/23. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) Modified on 4/25/2023 to indicate c/m to Nicholas A Black, 609 Smithview Drive, Maryville, TN 37803 (ABF).
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Co.(Headrick, Daniel)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Citizenship by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. (Headrick, Daniel)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/24/23. (c/m to Nicholas A Black, 609 Smithview Drive, Maryville, TN 37803) (ABF)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/24/23. (ABF) Modified on 4/24/2023 to indicate c/m to Nicholas A Black, 609 Smithview Drive, Maryville, TN 37803 (ABF).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/24/23. (c/m to Nicholas A Black, 609 Smithview Drive, Maryville, TN 37803) (ABF)
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Nicholas Black: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (c/m to Nicholas A Black, 609 Smithview Drive, Maryville, TN 37803)(ABF)
April 24, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. (ABF)
April 24, 2023 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (ABF)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Headrick on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Co (Headrick, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. (Evans, Matthew)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number L-21188. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5354938), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Removal)(Evans, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Mitchell
Represented By: Nicholas A Black
Represented By: William D Buckley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie W. Mitchell
Represented By: Nicholas A Black
Represented By: William D Buckley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Co
Represented By: Daniel C Headrick
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?