Dyke et al v. Quinwood Coal Partners LP et al
Plaintiff: Keith D. Dyke and Black Fuel Energy, LLC
Defendant: Quinwood Coal Partners LP and Quinwood Coal Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00381
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP Regarding Filing Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge (Gwinn, Heather)
December 12, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (ABF)
November 20, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Black Fuel Energy, LLC, Keith D. Dyke. (Price, James)
November 17, 2023 Filing 16 Now before the Court is the Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 15]. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 15]. To the extent necessary, Plaintiffs SHALL respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss [Doc. 7] fourteen days after the Court adjudicates the motion to remand [Doc. 13]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/17/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
November 16, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, to Transfer, and For Fees by Black Fuel Energy, LLC, Keith D. Dyke. (Price, James)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (Gwinn, Heather)
October 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Black Fuel Energy, LLC, Keith D. Dyke. (Price, James)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/27/2023. (CAT)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC. (Gwinn, Heather)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (Gwinn, Heather)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/27/23. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
October 26, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, to Transfer, and For Fees filed by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Declaration)(Gwinn, Heather)
October 26, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, to Transfer, and For Fees by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (Gwinn, Heather)
October 25, 2023 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (Gerken, Samantha)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/20/23. (JBR)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/20/23. (JBR)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/20/23. (JBR)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Samantha Gerken: Cover Sheet not included. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet. Requirements due by 10/25/2023. (JBR)
October 20, 2023 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
October 20, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (JBR)
October 20, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (JBR)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number 21321. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5503568), filed by Quinwood Coal Company, LLC, Quinwood Coal Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Gerken, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyke et al v. Quinwood Coal Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith D. Dyke
Represented By: James H Price
Represented By: Michael Ryan Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Fuel Energy, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Franz
Represented By: James H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinwood Coal Partners LP
Represented By: Samantha Gerken
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinwood Coal Company, LLC
Represented By: Samantha Gerken
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?