Invisible Fence, Inc. v. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC et al (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Invisible Fence, Inc.
Defendant: Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC, Ken Ehrman and Cesar Millan
Case Number: 3:2023cv00403
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Extension by All Defendants. (Bradford, Michael)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Cesar Millan. (ABF)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Invisible Fence, Inc.. Ken Ehrman served on 12/8/2023. (Winemiller, John)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Invisible Fence, Inc.. (Winemiller, John)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Protect Animals wih Satellites, LLC on 12/01/2023 (Winemiller, John) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (ABF).
November 30, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Ken Ehrman. (ABF)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Invisible Fence, Inc.. (Winemiller, John)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC and Protect Animals with Satellites, LLC c/o PHS Corporate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Protect Animals with Satellites, LLC c/o PHS Corporate Services, Inc.)(ABF)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Invisible Fence, Inc.. (Winemiller, John)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Invisible Fence, Inc.. (Winemiller, John)
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Invisible Fence, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KINO Holdings, Inc. for Invisible Fence, Inc.. (Winemiller, John)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/2023. (AML)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/2023. (AML)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/2023. (AML)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Benjamin Dooley - even if application for admission is pending, PHV motion still needs to be filed contemporaneously with complaint. Please have all documentation filed on or before December 1, 2023. (AML)
November 13, 2023 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (AML)
November 13, 2023 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Ken Ehrman, Cesar Millan, Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (AML)
November 13, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Invisible Fence, Inc.. (AML)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 1,371,021; 1,600,470; 1,765,230 . (Winemiller, John)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNEDC-5519936.), filed by Invisible Fence, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 1,371,021, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 1,600,470, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 1,765,230, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D September 22, 2020 Letter to Halo, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E October 5, 2020 Email from Ken Ehrman to Invisible Fence, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F August 19, 2022 Letter to Halo, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G August 26, 2022 Response from Halo, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H March 23, 2023 Letter to Halo, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I April 3, 2023 Letter to Halo, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J April 17, 2023 Response to Halo, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K May 25, 2023 Letter to Halo, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L August 8, 2023 Letter to Halo, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M April 10, 2023 Response from Halo, #14 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Winemiller, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Invisible Fence, Inc. v. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invisible Fence, Inc.
Represented By: John T Winemiller
Represented By: Elizabeth Harwood
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Ehrman
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Millan
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?