Radio Systems Corporation v. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC et al (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Radio Systems Corporation
Defendant: Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC, Ken Ehrman and Michael Ehrman
Case Number: 3:2023cv00404
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/04/2024. (KMK)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/04/2024. (KMK)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Governing Depositions - Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/04/2024. (KMK)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RELATED CASE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Invisible Fence, Inc. v. Protect Animals with Satellites, LLC, et al., No. 3:23-CV-403. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(2). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook, this case will also be assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 01/04/2024. (KMK)
January 4, 2024 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (KMK)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Extension by All Defendants. (Bradford, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule re #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ken Ehrman, Michael Ehrman, Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Bradford, Michael)
December 14, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radio Systems Corporation. Ken Ehrman served on 12/8/2023. (Winemiller, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Keith Griffith filed by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Ian G. McFarland filed by Radio Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - screenshots from www.amazon.com of consumer reviews, #2 Exhibit B - screenshots from www.trustpilot.com of consumer reviews)(Winemiller, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Richard Slovenko filed by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 [WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED; REFILED AS #16 ] AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Keith Griffith filed by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John) Modified on 12/12/2023 (ABF).
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radio Systems Corporation. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC served on 12/1/2023. (Winemiller, John)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ken Ehrman, Michael Ehrman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Michael Ehrman)(ABF)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC and Protect Animals with Satellites, LLC c/o PHS Corporate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Protect Animals with Satellites, LLC c/o PHS Corporate Services, Inc.)(ABF)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT Summons to be issued by Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
November 14, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Radio Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Radio Systems Holdings, Inc. for Radio Systems Corporation. (Winemiller, John)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Benjamin Dooley - even if application for admission is pending, PHV motion still needs to be filed contemporaneously with complaint. Please have all documentation filed on or before December 1, 2023. (AML)
November 13, 2023 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Ken Ehrman, Michael Ehrman, Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (AML)
November 13, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Radio Systems Corporation. (AML)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5520136.), filed by Radio Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Winemiller, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radio Systems Corporation v. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC et al (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radio Systems Corporation
Represented By: John T Winemiller
Represented By: Elizabeth Harwood
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Ehrman
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ehrman
Represented By: Michael J Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?