B&B properties v. Depositors Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B&B properties
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Nationwide
Case Number: 3:2023cv00432
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Service of Defendants Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Reviere, Russell)
February 1, 2024 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Curtis L Collier: Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2024. ( No Court Reporter/No Courtroom Deputy present) (BJL)
January 18, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 2/1/2024 02:30 PM Eastern time in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Parties must review the attached notice. (CBS)
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stewart, Jonathan)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Stewart, Jonathan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2024 03:30 PM Eastern time in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Parties must review the attached notice. (CBS) Modified on 12/18/2023 (AML).
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Reviere, Russell)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/14/23. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Policy ACPCPPD3029779023 by Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Insurance Policy ACPCPPD3029779023)(Rogers, Matthew)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Citizenship by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Rogers, Matthew)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Citizenship by Depositors Insurance Company. (Rogers, Matthew)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/7/2023. (BJL)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/7/2023. (BJL)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions,Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/7/2023. (BJL)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T Chastain on behalf of All Defendants (Chastain, Parks)
December 7, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (BJL)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Circuit Court, case number C3LA0132. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5538529), filed by Depositors Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of State Court Suit, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Depositors Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Other Nationwide Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Rogers, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&B properties v. Depositors Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&B properties
Represented By: Dylan Patrick Fink
Represented By: James C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Parks T Chastain
Represented By: Matthew Blake Rogers
Represented By: Russell E Reviere
Represented By: Jonathan D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Parks T Chastain
Represented By: Matthew Blake Rogers
Represented By: Jonathan D Stewart
Represented By: Russell E Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide
Represented By: Jonathan D Stewart
Represented By: Matthew Blake Rogers
Represented By: Parks T Chastain
Represented By: Russell E Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?