Adkins v. Tennessee Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Adkins
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Correction, Brian Eller, Unknown Correction Officer One, Unknown Correction Officer Two and Frank Strada
Case Number: 3:2024cv00181
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Sworn MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment or in the Alternative, A Motion So Set Aside a Judgment by Wayne Adkins. (BJL).
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT ORDER re #7 Memorandum Opinion: this prisoner's pro se complaint for violation of 42 U.S.C. 1983 is DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because the Court has CERTIFIED in the memorandum opinion that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/24/2024. (BJL)*Mailed to Wayne Adkins 88692 NORTHEAST CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX P.O. BOX 5000 MOUNTAIN CITY, TN 37683 Modified on 5/24/2024 (BJL).
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Accordingly, this action will be DISMISSED. The Court CERTIFIES that any appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT ORDER WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/24/2024. (BJL)*Mailed to Wayne Adkins 88692 NORTHEAST CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX P.O. BOX 5000 MOUNTAIN CITY, TN 37683
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT-Cover Letter with summons to #1 Complaint, by Wayne Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Brian Eller, #2 Summons-Frank Strada, #3 Summons-TDOC, #4 Summons-Unknown Officer 1, #5 Summons-Unknown Officer 2, #6 Envelope)(BJL)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the $350 filing fee; 3. The custodian of Plaintiffs inmate account is DIRECTED to submit payments toward the filing fee in the manner set forth above; 4. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order to the Court's financial deputy and the custodian of Plaintiff's inmate account; 5. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of his complaint (Doc. #1 ); 6. Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of entry of this order to return a copy of his complaint that contains the correct date for the fall at issue therein; 7. Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that if he does not timely comply with this order, the Court will DISMISS this action for want of prosecution and failure to comply with a Court order without further warning; and 8. Plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately inform the Court and Defendants, or their counsel of record, of any address changes in writing. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/25/2024. (BJL) Mailed order and complaint to Wayne Adkins 88692 and mailed order to the custodian of inmate accounts at NORTHEAST CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX P.O. BOX 5000 MOUNTAIN CITY, TN 37683.* Sent to the Court's Financial Deputy Clerks.
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. c/m Wayne Adkins, NECX. (MKM)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Wayne Adkins. (MKM)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wayne Adkins. (MKM)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Wayne Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Letter)(MKM) Modified text on 4/22/2024 to reflect file stamped copy mailed to Wayne Adkins Northeast Correctional Complex 5249 Hwy 67 w/ PO Box 5000, Mountain City, TN 37683. (MKM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Tennessee Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Eller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correction Officer One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correction Officer Two
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Strada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?