Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Wesley Financial Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC and Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Defendant: Wesley Financial Group, LLC and Charles William McDowell, III
Petitioner: American Resort Development Association
Case Number: 3:2024mc00011
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Enforcement of Administrative Subpoena
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Compel. ARDA SHALL produce the withheld documents within ten (10) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 4/1/24. (ABF)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Charles William McDowell, III, Wesley Financial Group, LLC. (Mascia, Paul)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Now before the Court is the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. 9], filed by Non-Party American Resort Development Association ("ARDA"), seeking a one-day extension to respond to Defendants' motion to compel. For grounds, its counsel was in the process of applying for her pro hac vice admission and filing credentials. ARDA's counsel has filed her Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Doc. 8], and ARDA has filed its Response in Opposition to the Motion to Compel [Doc. 10]. The Court finds ARDA's request well taken and GRANTS the motion [Doc. 9]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 3/8/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 3/8/2024 to indicate c/m to Katlin C. Cravatta, Foley & Lardner LLP, 301 East Pine Street, Suite 1200, Orlando, FL 32801 (ABF).
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 3/8/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 3/8/2024 to indicate c/m to Katlin C. Cravatta, Foley & Lardner LLP, 301 East Pine Street, Suite 1200, Orlando, FL 32801 (ABF).
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by American Resort Development Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Clements, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(ABF)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 MOTION to Compel by American Resort Development Association. (ABF)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Katlin Cravatta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #300003377.) by American Resort Development Association. (ABF)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by American Resort Development Association (ABF)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Now before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Compel [Doc. 1]. The Court ORDERS American Resort Development Association to respond to the motion on or before March 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 2/27/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.)(AGA) Modified on 2/27/2024 (KMK): copy of order emailed to attorney Cravatta at kcravatta@foley.com
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) - Attorney Katlin C. Cravatta (copy mailed to attorney Cravatta) (KMK)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from the Middle District of Florida; Case Number 6:24-mc-00003.
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Non-Party American Resort Development Association's Amended Unopposed Motion to Transfer; denying as moot #2 Non-Party American Resort Development Association's Unopposed Motion to Transfer. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee.The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/21/2024. (RMN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/26/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee by American Resort Development Association. (Cravatta, Katlin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/26/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee by American Resort Development Association. (Cravatta, Katlin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/26/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order FEE PAID. Filing fee for new miscellaneous case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21733293 for $52 paid. (Bennett, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/26/2024.]
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Motion to Compel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof against American Resort Development Association filed by Wesley Financial Group, LLC, Charles William McDowell, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Bennett, John) Modified to edit docket text on 1/31/2024 (RLK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/26/2024.] Modified on 2/26/2024 (KMK) to flatten the civil cover sheet PDF

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Wesley Financial Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: John J Bennett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles William McDowell, III
Represented By: John J Bennett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Resort Development Association
Represented By: Katlin C. Cravatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?