Dauscha v. UP Communications Services LLC

Defendant: UP Communications Services LLC
Plaintiff: Francis J. Dauscha, III
Case Number: 4:2013cv00050
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Winchester Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Intervene; The trustee shall file his intervening complaint within seven days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/6/2013. (DJH, )
November 18, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff filed by C. Kenneth Still. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/18/13. (GRE, )
September 10, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/10/13. (GRE, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dauscha v. UP Communications Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UP Communications Services LLC
Represented By: Joycelyn A Stevenson
Represented By: Brian M Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Dauscha, III
Represented By: Andy L. Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?