Owen v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Jeanie M. Owen
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2018cv00071
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, IFP Order and Plaintiff's SSN served on U.S. Attorney, OGC, Attorney Gen on 12/10/2018, filed by Jeanie M. Owen. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re IFP Service. (aws, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney's Office)(aws, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Presently before the Court is an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (in forma pauperis)[Doc. 2] filed by Plaintiff, Jeanie M. Owen. After a review of the application, it is hereby ORDERED that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. It shall be the responsibility of Plaintiff's counsel to complete the summonses and obtain service of process, or, in the alternative, to return such completed summonses to the Clerk of Court. In the event, Plaintiff's counsel returns the completed summonses to the Clerk of Court, the Clerk shall issue the summonses and forward such summonses and USM-285 forms to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/30/18. (Steger, Christopher)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11-30-18. (KMG, )
November 30, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JBR)
November 30, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3828330.) filed by Jeanie M. Owen (JBR)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3828330.) by Jeanie M. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing PA Supreme Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing WDPA, #3 Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeanie M. Owen. (Osterhout, Karl)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Jeanie M. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons Atty Gen)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie M. Owen
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?