Pitts et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I et al (TV2)

Plaintiff: Mary Jo Pitts and Terry Pitts
Defendant: AM Cleaning Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. and Kroger East/Nashville Store #559
Case Number: 4:2019cv00016
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Susan K Lee
1 Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2020 01:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/9/19. (JBR, )
March 20, 2019 Filing fee paid $ 90.00, receipt number K3037655. (ADA)
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by AM Cleaning Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AM Cleaning Inc. for AM Cleaning Inc.. (Elliott, Stephen)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J. Weissman on behalf of Mary Jo Pitts, Terry Pitts. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/11/2019. (KRS, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Mary Jo Pitts, Terry Pitts (Raybin, Benjamin)
March 6, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Weissman filed by Mary Jo Pitts, Terry Pitts . (BDG, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard E. Spicer on behalf of Kroger East/Nashville Store #559, Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form (KRS, ) Modified on 3/6/2019 (BDG, ). Order mailed to Spicer.
March 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Kroger East/Nashville Store #559, The Kroger Co., Kroger Limited Partnership I as to Kroger East/Nashville Store #559, Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. (BDG, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Weissman by Mary Jo Pitts, Terry Pitts. (Raybin, Benjamin)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W Elliott on behalf of AM Cleaning Inc. (Elliott, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :The $90.00 filing fee must be paid. (BDG, )Notice mailed to Spicer.
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Kroger East/Nashville Store #559, Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co..(Uhorchuk, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kroger East/Nashville Store #559, Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co.. (Uhorchuk, Robert) Modified on 3/5/2019 (BDG, ). Payment received. Receipt number c1016442.
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Kraft Raybin on behalf of Mary Jo Pitts, Terry Pitts (Raybin, Benjamin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorneys Richard Spicer and David Weissman are not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Richard Spicer and David Weissman)(JCK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Case Cover Sheet by Kroger East/Nashville Store #559, Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co.. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/19/2019. (JCK)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/19/2019. (JCK)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/19/2019. (JCK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal : Please pay the filing by overnighting payment and please file a completed civil cover sheet using the event Supplement, found under the category Other Documents and link it back to the notice of removal. Requirements due by 2/25/2019. (JCK)
February 19, 2019 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JCK)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Kroger Company, Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Uhorchuk, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bedford County Circuit Court, case number CV-13443. (Receipt number for filing fee c1016410), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Uhorchuk, Robert) Modified on 2/25/2019 (BDG, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jo Pitts
Represented By: David J Weissman
Represented By: Benjamin Kraft Raybin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Pitts
Represented By: David J Weissman
Represented By: Benjamin Kraft Raybin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Cleaning Inc.
Represented By: Stephen W Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Richard Spicer
Represented By: Robert J Uhorchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Richard Spicer
Represented By: Robert J Uhorchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger East/Nashville Store #559
Represented By: Richard Spicer
Represented By: Robert J Uhorchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?