Azzam Medical Services, LLC et al v. Platinum Group USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diverse Medical Management, Inc. and Azzam Medical Services, LLC
Defendant: Americore Health, LLC, Platinum Group USA, Inc., The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P., Grant White, James B. Biden, Amer Rustom and Michael Lewitt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00046
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-15-19. (KMG)
August 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of L. Webb Campbell II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4049866.) filed by James B. Biden, The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P., Amer Rustom, Platinum Group USA, Inc., Michael Lewitt as to James B. Biden, Michael Lewitt, Platinum Group USA, Inc., Amer Rustom, The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P. (BDG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of L. Webb Campbell II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4049866.) by James B. Biden, Michael Lewitt, Platinum Group USA, Inc., Amer Rustom, The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Hickman, J)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by James B. Biden, Michael Lewitt, Platinum Group USA, Inc., Amer Rustom, The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P.. (Hickman, J)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Azzam Medical Services, LLC, Diverse Medical Management, Inc.. Americore Health, LLC served on 7/25/2019. (Peal, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Azzam Medical Services, LLC, Diverse Medical Management, Inc.. James B. Biden served on 7/24/2019; Michael Lewitt served on 7/24/2019; Platinum Group USA, Inc. served on 7/24/2019; Amer Rustom served on 7/24/2019; The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P. served on 7/24/2019. (Peal, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to James B. Biden, Michael Lewitt, Amer Rustom, Grant White. (BDG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Americore Health, LLC, Platinum Group USA, Inc., The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P., Amer Rustom, Michael Lewitt, Grant White, James B. Biden., filed by Azzam Medical Services, LLC, Diverse Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Business Card, #2 Exhibit 2- Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Text Message, #4 Exhibit 4 - Text Message, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email and Attachment, #6 Exhibit 6 - Burch Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 7 - Miller Affidavit, #8 Exhibit 8 - Text Message, #9 Exhibit 9 - Text Message, #10 Summons for Amer Rustom, #11 Summons for Michael Lewitt, #12 Summons for Grant White, #13 Summons for James B. Biden)(Peal, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Azzam Medical Services, LLC. (Peal, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Diverse Medical Management, Inc.. (Peal, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/20/2019. (CAT)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/20/2019. (CAT)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/20/2019. (CAT)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Azzam Medical Services, LLC, Diverse Medical Management, Inc. (CAT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Americore Health, LLC, Platinum Group USA, Inc., The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Summons The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P., #2 Summons Americore Health, LLC) (CAT)
June 20, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Americore Health, LLC, Platinum Group USA, Inc., The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4003414.), filed by Azzam Medical Services, LLC, Diverse Medical Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Peal, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azzam Medical Services, LLC et al v. Platinum Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americore Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: J Scott Hickman
Represented By: Lee Webb Campbell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Third Friday Total Return Fund, L.P.
Represented By: J Scott Hickman
Represented By: Lee Webb Campbell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Biden
Represented By: J Scott Hickman
Represented By: Lee Webb Campbell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amer Rustom
Represented By: J Scott Hickman
Represented By: Lee Webb Campbell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lewitt
Represented By: J Scott Hickman
Represented By: Lee Webb Campbell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diverse Medical Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Peal
Represented By: Mark W Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azzam Medical Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert A Peal
Represented By: Mark W Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?