SmartBank v. Cartron et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: SmartBank
Defendant: Charis Witt Cartron and Michael B. Cartron
Case Number: 4:2019cv00062
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah M Hodges on behalf of All Defendants (Hodges, Jeremiah)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartBank. (Maddux, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA : requirements due by 10/15/2019. (AML)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SmartBank. Charis Witt Cartron served on 9/27/2019; Michael B. Cartron served on 9/27/2019. (Maddux, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SmartBank identifying Corporate Parent SmartFinancial, Inc. for SmartBank. (Maddux, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charis Witt Cartron, Michael B. Cartron. (Attachments: #1 Other Summons Issued)(CNC)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by SmartBank. (CNC)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/20/19. (CNC)
September 19, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CNC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4083314.), filed by SmartBank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Maddux, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SmartBank v. Cartron et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SmartBank
Represented By: Grayson Chambers
Represented By: Jeffrey William Maddux
Represented By: Stephen D Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charis Witt Cartron
Represented By: Jeremiah M Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Cartron
Represented By: Jeremiah M Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?