Rogers v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Brenda Arlene Rogers
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv00008
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (BDG)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SSA Office of General Counsel, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BDG)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa A. Palmer on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Arlene Rogers. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 02/10/2020. (KRS)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/7/20. (KFB)
February 5, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4221771.) filed by Brenda Arlene Rogers (AMP)
February 5, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4221771.) by Brenda Arlene Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Arlene Rogers. (Palmer, Melissa)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Brenda Arlene Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Arlene Rogers
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?