George v. City of Winchester et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Next of Kin Melissa E. George and Melissa E. George
Defendant: City of Winchester, Tennessee, ind & official cap James C. Bishop, Sergeant James C. Bishop and City of Winchester
Case Number: 4:2020cv00026
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 Administrative Notice to Counsel re 16 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : requirements due by 7/20/2020. *Attorney George Sachs must register for CM/ECF.(BJL)*Mailed to Attorney George Sachs.
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa E. George. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/06/2020. (KRS)
June 24, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Melissa E. George (GRE)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George M. Sachs on behalf of Melissa E. George. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 06/24/2020. (KRS) Modified on 6/25/2020 (BJL).*Copied of NEF mailed to Attorney George M Sachs
June 23, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney George Sachs ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4384253.) filed by Melissa E. George, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Melissa E. George as to Melissa E. George (CNC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney George Sachs ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4384253.) by Melissa E. George. (Smith, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing by Christopher W Smith on behalf of Melissa E. George (Smith, Christopher)
June 19, 2020 Manual Filing of Body Camera Footage submitted via US Mail was received by Clerk's Office and placed in the proper drawer. (AML)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to City of Winchester and James C. Bishop(in his individual capacity). (Attachments: #1 Summons Bishop)(SAC)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (SAC)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Melissa E. George Refiling Flattened Summons (D2) (Smith, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Melissa E. George Refiling Flattened Summons (D1) (Smith, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Melissa E. George re #1 Complaint, Refiling Flattened Civil Cover Sheet (Smith, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Melissa E. George Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit B to Complaint (Smith, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa E. George. (Smith, Christopher)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/15/2020. (JCK)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/15/2020. (JCK)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/15/2020. (JCK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel. Civil cover sheet blank and filed in a filalble format. Please refile a completed civil cover sheet in a flattened non-fillable format. Requirements due by 6/22/2020. (JCK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff's attorney information is not completed on summons and summons were filed in a fillable format. Please refile completed summons in a flattened non-fillable format. Requirements due by 6/22/2020. (JCK)
June 15, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JCK)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4374308.), filed by Melissa E. George. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Incident Report, #2 Exhibit Ex. C Summary Report, #3 Summons Bishop Summons, #4 Summons City of Winchester Summons, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. City of Winchester et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winchester, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ind & official cap James C. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant James C. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Next of Kin Melissa E. George
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa E. George
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Represented By: W Lyon Chadwick, Jr
Represented By: George M Sachs
Represented By: Dominick R Smith
Represented By: David R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?