UTZ Quality Foods, LLC v. Dirty South BBQ Co, LLC, et. al. (PLR2)
Plaintiff: UTZ Quality Foods, LLC
Defendant: Timothy Troy LONG, TROY LONG and Dirty South BBQ Co., LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00043
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Answer deadline set from case transfer. Answer due deadline termed. (SAC)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 11, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form(flatten/print to pdf before filing in ECF-make a non fillable form when filing) (SAC)Order mailed to non-ECF parties.
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 11, 2020. (SAC) Modified on 9/11/2020, mailed to non ECF parties. (SAC).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 11, 2020. (SAC) Modified on 9/11/2020, mailed to non-ECF parties. (SAC).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 11, 2020. (SAC)Order mailed to all non-ECF counsel.
September 10, 2020 Filing 24 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: Trademark form (A120) requirements due by 9/25/2020. (BJL)* Mailed to Attorneys Camille Miller, John Cloak and Melanie Miller
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Camille Miller, John Cloak, Melanie Miller and Joel Ready.
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01146. Modified on 9/10/2020 (BJL).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/28/20. 7/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/28/20. 7/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/30/20. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 3/1/21. . SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/30/20. 6/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 18 Report Of the Parties of the Rule 26(F) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC. (CLOAK, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LOCATION AND TIME CHANGE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESET FOR 6/30/2020 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE, COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov IN Philadelphia BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 06/17/2020.06/17/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 Combined Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply and Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Reply regarding the Motion to Dismiss re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, CAMILLE) Modified on 6/15/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(READY, JOEL) Modified on 6/9/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Camille M. Miller, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, CAMILLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(READY, JOEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/30/2020 05:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS (UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED) BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report Discovery Plan)(amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT - DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 14 DAYS OR UNTIL MAY 18, 2020 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 05/04/2020.05/04/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN TREVOR CLOAK on behalf of UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC with Certificate of Service(CLOAK, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE A. MILLER on behalf of UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC with Certificate of Service(MILLER, MELANIE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(READY, JOEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 Response by TIMOTHY TROY LONG. (Attachments: #1 Response 2, #2 Response 3, #3 Response 4, #4 Postal Receipt) (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Default Entered (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 7, 2020 DEFAULT BY DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Default - Request for Clerk's Default - UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC against DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Camille M. Miller, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, CAMILLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC re: Karen Barnes served Summons and Complaint upon DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC by Personal. DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (MILLER, CAMILLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC re: Karen Barnes served Summons and Complaint upon TIMOTHY TROY LONG by Personal. TIMOTHY TROY LONG served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (MILLER, CAMILLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC.(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 2 Summons Issued as to DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 3/2/2020 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC. (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIRTY SOUTH BBQ CO. LLC, TIMOTHY TROY LONG ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE212152.), filed by UTZ QUALITY FOODS, LLC.(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UTZ Quality Foods, LLC v. Dirty South BBQ Co, LLC, et. al. (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Troy LONG
Represented By: JOEL AARON READY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY LONG
Represented By: JOEL AARON READY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirty South BBQ Co., LLC
Represented By: JOEL AARON READY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTZ Quality Foods, LLC
Represented By: MELANIE A. MILLER
Represented By: CAMILLE M. MILLER
Represented By: JOHN TREVOR CLOAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?