Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. Amacher
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. and Costa Del Mar, Inc.
Defendant: Christy Amacher doing business as Pretty Discoveries Boutique
Case Number: 4:2021cv00043
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (BDG)
November 12, 2021 Filing 21 Defendant Christy Amacher d/b/a Pretty Discoveries Boutique ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christy Amacher.(Davis, Floyd)
November 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. (Goldstein, Andrew)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-19-21. (KMG) Modified on 10/20/2021 (BDG). Order mailed and emailed to David B. Rosemberg.
October 19, 2021 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4869330.) filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc., Costa Del Mar, Inc. as to Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. (BDG)
October 18, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. re #16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4869330.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida (D. Rosemberg))(Goldstein, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4869330.)An applicant must submit with his or her motion for admission pro hac vice a certificate of good standing from the other United States District Court where the attorney is admitted and entitled to practice.(BDG)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4869330.) by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FL Certificate of Good Standing of David Rosemberg, Esq.)(Goldstein, Andrew)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 Administrative Notice to Counsel #12 First MOTION for Admission to PracticePro Hac Vice :Please refile using correct event i.e. Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Motions, Appear Pro Hac Vice. requirements due by 10/18/2021. (BDG)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys, David Rosemberg and Jake VanAusdall, are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf (BDG)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Completed Sponsor Form for EDTN Admission Application for Jacob VanAusdall, Esq., #2 Exhibit Certificates of Admission to MDTN and WDTN for Jacob VanAusdall, Esq.)(Goldstein, Andrew)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION for Admission to PracticePro Hac Vice by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FL Certificate of Good Standing of David Rosemberg, Esq.)(Goldstein, Andrew)
October 11, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christy Amacher on 09/30/2021, filed by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.. (Goldstein, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Costa Del Mar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FGX International, Inc. for Costa Del Mar, Inc.. (Goldstein, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Oakley, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Luxottica Group S.p.A. for Oakley, Inc.. (Goldstein, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Luxottica Group S.p.A. identifying Corporate Parent EssilorLuxottica SA for Luxottica Group S.p.A.. (Goldstein, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/28/2021. (AML) Mailed to non-registered attorneys.
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/28/2021. (AML) Mailed to non-registered attorneys
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 9/28/2021. (AML) Mailed to non-registered attorneys
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to David Rosemberg (AML) Mailed to Attorney Rosemberg
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Jake VanAusdall. (AML) Mailed to Attorney VanAusdall
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christy Amacher. (AML)
September 28, 2021 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AML)
September 28, 2021 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. (AML)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4854498.), filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Costa Del Mar, Inc., Oakley, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. Amacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: David B. Rosemberg
Represented By: Jake VanAusdall
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Goldstein, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Rosemberg
Represented By: Jake VanAusdall
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Goldstein, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Costa Del Mar, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Rosemberg
Represented By: Jake VanAusdall
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Goldstein, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Amacher doing business as Pretty Discoveries Boutique
Represented By: Floyd D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?