Ewing v. SciPlay Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Ewing
Defendant: SciPlay Corporation and SciPlay Games, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00060
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam L. Hoeflich on behalf of Defendants SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 02/12/2024. (KRS) Modified on 2/13/2024 Serviced via email and mail to Adam L. Hoeflich. (AWS)
February 9, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
February 9, 2024 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee filed by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
February 9, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam L. Hoeflich ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5591339.) by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, Robert)
February 9, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam L. Hoeflich filed by SciPlay Games, LLC, SciPlay Corporation. (AWS)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: For good cause shown, the parties' motions (Case No. 4:23-cv-55, Doc. 23; Case No. 4:23-cv-57, Doc. No. 27; Case No. 4:23-cv-58, Doc. No. 25; 4:23-cv-60, Doc. No. 29; Case No. 4:23-cv-61, Doc. No. 22; Case No. 4:23-cv-62; Doc. No. 23) are GRANTED. The parties' briefing schedule shall be as follows: 1. Defendants deadline to file its opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand SHALL BE February 9, 2024; 2. Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply in support of Plaintiff's motion to remand SHALL BE February 16, 2024; 3. Plaintiff's deadline to file oppositions to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and motion to dismiss SHALL BE March 1, 2024; 4. Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and motion to dismiss SHALL BE March 29, 2024. Should the parties require relief from the Briefing Schedule above, the parties SHALL FILE a motion with the Court at the appropriate time. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to docket this Order in each of the above-captioned cases. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/1/2024. (BJL) Modified on 2/1/2024 (BJL).*Mailed to John E. Norris Davis & Norris, LLP 2154 Highland Avenue #4002 Birmingham, AL 35205
January 26, 2024 Filing 29 STIPULATION - Stipulated Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Defendant's Motion to Compel and Motion to Dismiss by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric F. Dement on behalf of Defendants SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/25/2024. (KRS) Modified on 1/25/2024 Serviced to Eric Dement via email & mail. (AWS).
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison G. Wheeler on behalf of Defendants SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/25/2024. (KRS) Modified on 1/25/2024 Serviced to Alison Wheeler via email & mail. (AWS)
January 22, 2024 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Cameron Lee, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Cameron Lee, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Cameron Lee, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Cameron Lee, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Cameron Lee)(Cooper, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric F. Dement ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5572241.) by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alison G. Wheeler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5572233.) by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooper, Robert)
January 22, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alison G. Wheeler filed by SciPlay Games, LLC, SciPlay Corporation, #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric F. Dement filed by SciPlay Games, LLC, SciPlay Corporation (AWS)
January 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee by Lauren Ewing. (Ware, Dargan)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dargan M. Ware on behalf of Plaintiff Lauren Ewing. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/02/2024. (KRS)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey L. Bowling on behalf of Plaintiff Lauren Ewing. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/02/2024. (KRS) Modified on 1/3/2024 Serviced via mail and email to Jeffrey L. Bowling. (AWS).
January 2, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90, Receipt# 100000870) by Lauren Ewing. (AWS)
January 2, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Lauren Ewing. (AWS)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER in case 4:23-cv-00055-CLC-SKL; denying (17) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re (17 in 4:23-cv-00056-CLC-SKL) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , (9 in 4:23-cv-00057-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Doc. 1-1), (11 in 4:23-cv-00060-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint, (7 in 4:23-cv-00061-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer in case 4:23-cv-00056-CLC-SKL; denying (9) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re (17 in 4:23-cv-00056-CLC-SKL) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , (9 in 4:23-cv-00057-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Doc. 1-1), (11 in 4:23-cv-00060-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint, (7 in 4:23-cv-00061-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer in case 4:23-cv-00057-CLC-SKL; denying (11) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 4:23-cv-00060-CLC-SKL; denying (7) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re (17 in 4:23-cv-00056-CLC-SKL) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , (9 in 4:23-cv-00057-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Doc. 1-1), (11 in 4:23-cv-00060-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint, (7 in 4:23-cv-00061-CLC-SKL) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer in case 4:23-cv-00061-CLC-SKL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on December 28, 2023. (SAC)Order mailed to all non ECF parties.
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASES. Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger; District Judge Thomas A Varlan; District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and District Judge J Ronnie Greer no longer assigned to cases. Case reassigned to District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on December 28, 2023. (SAC) Modified on 12/28/2023, Order mailed to Davis, Ware, Bowling, Norris, Moon and Barnett (SAC).
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Citizenship by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 FILED IN ERROR. Attorney to refile under corrected event code. Certificate of Corporate Interest by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Cooper, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2023 to update text (AML).
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. Receipt#100000857) by Dargan Ware for Lauren Ewing. (CNC)
December 27, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Lauren Ewing (CNC)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Cooper, Robert)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASES.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on December 20, 2023. (SAC)Order sent to Chief Judge. Modified on 12/20/2023, Order mailed to D. Frank Davis, Dargan Ware, John Norris and Wesley Barnett with Davis and Norris and Attorney Bowling, Attorney Richter and Moon. (SAC).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Wesley S. Love on behalf of Defendants SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 12/20/2023. (KRS)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/18/23. (ABF)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/18/23. (ABF)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/18/23. (ABF)
December 18, 2023 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (ABF)
December 18, 2023 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (ABF)
December 18, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wesley S. Love filed by SciPlay Games, LLC, SciPlay Corporation (ABF)
December 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Clayton, E)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wesley S. Love by SciPlay Corporation, SciPlay Games, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Clayton, E)
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SciPlay Games, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SciPlay Corporation, Corporate Parent Light & Wonder, Inc., Corporate Parent Light & Wonder International, Inc. for SciPlay Games, LLC. (Clayton, E)
December 15, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SciPlay Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Light & Wonder, Inc. for SciPlay Corporation. (Clayton, E)
December 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coffee County Circuit Court, case number 23-cv-49179. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5547096), filed by SciPlay Games, LLC, SciPlay Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric Dement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Robert Gustafson, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Philip Alvarado)(Clayton, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. SciPlay Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ewing
Represented By: Dargan M. Ware
Represented By: Garth R Segroves
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SciPlay Corporation
Represented By: E Steele Clayton, IV
Represented By: Robert E Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Wesley Love
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Alison G Wheeler
Represented By: Eric F Dement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SciPlay Games, LLC
Represented By: E Steele Clayton, IV
Represented By: Robert E Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Wesley Love
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Alison G Wheeler
Represented By: Eric F Dement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?