Ewing v. VGW Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Ewing
Defendant: VGW Ltd., VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW US, Inc. and VGW Luckyland, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00062
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee filed by Lauren Ewing. (Ware, Dargan)
February 9, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for consolidated oral argument re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Kinard, Nathan)
February 9, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee filed by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Kinard, Nathan)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: For good cause shown, the parties' motions (Case No. 4:23-cv-55, Doc. 23; Case No. 4:23-cv-57, Doc. No. 27; Case No. 4:23-cv-58, Doc. No. 25; 4:23-cv-60, Doc. No. 29; Case No. 4:23-cv-61, Doc. No. 22; Case No. 4:23-cv-62; Doc. No. 23) are GRANTED. The parties' briefing schedule shall be as follows: 1. Defendants deadline to file its opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand SHALL BE February 9, 2024; 2. Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply in support of Plaintiff's motion to remand SHALL BE February 16, 2024; 3. Plaintiff's deadline to file oppositions to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and motion to dismiss SHALL BE March 1, 2024; 4. Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and motion to dismiss SHALL BE March 29, 2024. Should the parties require relief from the Briefing Schedule above, the parties SHALL FILE a motion with the Court at the appropriate time. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to docket this Order in each of the above-captioned cases. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/1/2024. (BJL) Modified on 2/1/2024 (BJL).*Mailed to John E. Norris Davis & Norris, LLP 2154 Highland Avenue #4002 Birmingham, AL 35205
January 29, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate Judge by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc. (Kinard, Nathan)
January 26, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kinard, Nathan)
January 22, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of Michael Thunder)(Kinard, Nathan)
January 22, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl of Michael Thunder)(Kinard, Nathan)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory D. Beaman on behalf of Defendants VGW Holdings Ltd., VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW US, Inc., and VGW Luckyland, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry.. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/19/2024. (KRS) Attorney Beaman sent notification to register on 1/22/2024 (AML).
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Behnam Dayanim on behalf of Defendants VGW Holdings Ltd., VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW US, Inc., and VGW Luckyland, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/19/2024. (KRS) Attorney Dayanim sent notification to register on 1/22/2024 (AML).
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Coffee County, Tennessee by Lauren Ewing. (Ware, Dargan)
January 12, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Gregory Beaman) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5564856.) filed by VGW Luckyland, Inc., #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Behnam Dayanim) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5564852.) filed by VGW Luckyland, Inc. (AML)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Gregory Beaman) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5564856.) by VGW Luckyland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Kinard, Nathan)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Behnam Dayanim) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5564852.) by VGW Luckyland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Kinard, Nathan)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Vice by Attorney Jeffrey L. Bowling to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lauren Ewing. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/03/2024. (KRS) Sent to Attorney Bowling on 1/4/2024 (AML).
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dargan M. Ware to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lauren Ewing. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry.. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 01/03/2024. (KRS)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid, Receipt No. 100000870) by Lauren Ewing. (AML)
January 2, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Lauren Ewing (AML)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASES. Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger; District Judge Thomas A Varlan; District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and District Judge J Ronnie Greer no longer assigned to cases. Case reassigned to District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on December 28, 2023. (SAC) Modified on 12/28/2023, Order mailed to Davis, Ware, Bowling, Norris, Moon and Barnett (SAC).
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Dargan Ware to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt attached) by Lauren Ewing. (AML)
December 27, 2023 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Lauren Ewing (AML)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Doc. 1-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on December 21, 2023. (SAC)Order mailed to Bowling and Norris.
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT.Court concludes the case is related to the first filed case, that is Case No. 4:23-cv-055.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on December 21, 2023. (SAC)Order mailed to Attorneys Bowling and Norris. Modified on 12/21/2023, Order also sent to Chief United States District Judge Travis R. McDonough. (SAC).
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Attorneys Norris and Bowling. (SAC)Notice mailed to Attorneys Norris and Bowling.
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on December 20, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form(flatten/non-fillable when filing in ECF)) (SAC) Modified on 12/20/2023, Order mailed to John E. Norris and Jeffrey Bowling. (SAC).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on December 20, 2023. (SAC)Order mailed to Bowling and Norris.
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on December 20, 2023. (SAC)Order mailed to Bowling and Norris.
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on December 20, 2023. (SAC) Modified on 12/20/2023, Order mailed to Bowling and Norris. (SAC).
December 20, 2023 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (SAC)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint (Doc. 1-1) by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Kinard, Nathan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc., VGW US, Inc.. (Kinard, Nathan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Coffee County, Tennessee, case number 23-cv-49182. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5548933), filed by VGW US, Inc., VGW Holdings US, Inc., VGW Ltd., VGW Luckyland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Docs, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Thunder, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinard, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. VGW Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ewing
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bowling
Represented By: John E. Norris
Represented By: Dargan M. Ware
Represented By: Garth R Segroves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Lee Kinard
Represented By: Anthony A Jackson
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Holdings US, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Lee Kinard
Represented By: Anthony A Jackson
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW US, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Lee Kinard
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Represented By: Anthony A Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGW Luckyland, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Lee Kinard
Represented By: Anthony A Jackson
Represented By: Behnam Dayanim
Represented By: Gregory D. Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?