Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dura Automotive Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dura Automotive Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00059
Filed: September 11, 2009
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2012 194 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/31/12. (dt)
August 27, 2012 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference held on 8/24/2012. The parties and their respective representatives met and negotiated in good faith. Although considerable progress was made, the parties did not agree on a settlement of this case. If the parties conclude that further discussions with the undersigned Magistrate Judge would be helpful, counsel may contact chambers at 736-5878 to schedule an available time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/27/12. (dt)
August 21, 2012 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A Hearing is set in this action for 8/22/2012 at 2:30 PM Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/21/12. (dt)
August 17, 2012 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/17/12. (dt)
May 31, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/31/12. (dt)
May 11, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion to File In Excess of Page Limit. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/11/12. (dt)
April 17, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 4/17/12. (dt)
March 6, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint MOTION to Modify 56 Scheduling Order 69 is Granted. Discovery deadline reset for 4/13/2012. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/61/2. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dura Automotive Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dura Automotive Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?