Poarch v. Fritz et al
Plaintiff: |
Lewis Poarch |
Defendant: |
Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Jacob Fritz |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00069 |
Filed: |
June 2, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Columbia Office |
County: |
Marshall |
Presiding Judge: |
William J. Haynes |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
11
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2: Jury Trial set for 11/17/2015 at 9:00 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 9/2/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
10
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: The Jury Trial is set for 11/17/2015 at 9:00 AM and the Pretrial Conference is set for 11/2/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Discovery due by 5/28/2015. Motions due by 6/30/2015. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all other deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing
8
AGREED ORDER of Dismissal as to the uninsured motorist carrier, Safeway Insurance Company. IT IS ORDERED the Complaint in this cause be and is hereby dismissed - without prejudice - to the Plaintiff as it pertains to SW, the uninsured/underinsured carrier of Plaintiff, and any court costs in this cause against SW, if any, shall be assessed at a later date, by further order of this court. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/8/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER RESETTING HEARING: The Case Management Conference set in this action for Monday, August 25, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. is RESET for Monday, August 18, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Columbia, Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 7/31/2014. (ds)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?