Kirk v. Correction Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: Jason Kirk
Defendant: Correction Corporation of America, Damon Hiniger, Jason Medlin, Roger West, Cherry Lindamood, Eric Bryant, Katherine Buttram, Jane Harrison, Danial Dodd, Christopher McClain, Hank Inman, Jane Inman, John Ward, Ryan Deathrage, Jane Jackson, John Harville, Derrick Schofield, Tony Parker, Jason Woodall, Bryant Williams and Truman Cole
Case Number: 1:2016cv00031
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
County: Maury
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 177 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, after a de novo review, the Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. The Complaint is therefore DISMISSED as moot. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. The Court CERTIFIES that an appeal in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/13/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 167 Report and Recommendation. Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 167), to which Plaintiff did not object. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and conducted a de novo review of the record. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly: (1) the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to Plaintiff' federal law claims; (2) the Complaint is DISMISSED W ITHOUT PREJUDICE with respect to Plaintiff's state law claims; (3) The Court CERTIFIES that an appeal in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); and (4) The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/19/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying 128 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 128 Motion ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 162 Report and Recommendation. Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. No. 162), t o which Plaintiff filed timely objections (Doc. No. 165). The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation, Plaintiff's objections, and conducted a de novo review of the record. Plaintiff argues that Magistrate Judge Brown erred in Sectio n II.D. of his Report and Recommendation by misunderstanding the Tennessee Department of Correction grievance process. (Doc. No. 165.) However, Judge Brown correctly cited the grievance process found that Plaintiff did not move any of his grievanc es to the next level after having not received a response to them in the time allotted under the Tennessee Department of Correction Policy. (Doc. No. 162 at 11-12.) Accordingly, Plaintiff did not exhaust his administrative remedies, and his objec tions are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. 128) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/18/17. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff has failed to show that he is entitled to relief under Rule 54(b). Therefore, the undersigned recommends that plaintiff's motion (Doc. 128) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/26/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 1/3/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS (1) that the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Docket Entry No. 3) be DENIED; (2) that the plaintiff's motions for leave to file an amended complaint (D ocket Entry Nos. 49 and 68) be GRANTED; (3) that the defendants' motions to strike the amended complaint (Docket Entry Nos. 51 and 59) be DENIED; (4) that the claims against Bryant Williams, Kathy Inman, Joel Foster and Cole Turner be dismiss ed without prejudice for want of prosecution; (5) that the defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 60) as it applies to all CCA and SCCC defendants, with the exception of Patricia Harrison and Daniel Harville, be GRANTED; (6) that the plaintiff's motions (Docket Entry Nos. 103 and 111) for an evidentiary hearing be DENIED; and (7) that the defendants' motions to dismiss (Docket Entry Nos. 52, 56 and 77) as they apply to the TDOC defendants be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/13/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. Correction Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Hiniger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Lindamood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Buttram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danial Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Deathrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?