Tate v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: James Tate
Defendant: (f/n/u) Jones, (f/n/u) Brewster and Debra Kelly
Case Number: 1:2017cv00002
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Waverly D. Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 76 is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 70 ) is GRANTED. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/7/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The R&R (Doc. No. 56 ) is ADOPTED. The Complaint against Debra Kelly is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/10/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 64 ) that the Court construes as a motion to ascertain status is DENIED AS MOOT and Plaintiff's Motions for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. Nos. 3 and 14 ) are DENIED, for the reasons in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation that is adopted by this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/13/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab) Modified on 7/13/2017 (ab).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION:For the reasons stated above, the Magistrate Judge recommends the amended complaint as to Defendant Kelly be dismissed with prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, or alternatively, under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, f or failure to state a claim. The claims as to the other Defendants remain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/13/2017. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?