Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. City of Pulaski, Tennessee

Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: City of Pulaski, Tennessee
Case Number: 1:2018cv00061
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Giles
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Mark E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/28/2018. (jw)
August 24, 2018 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (Martin, Mark)
August 17, 2018 6 MOTION for attorney(s) Mark E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2733500) by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Mark)
August 17, 2018 5 Summons issued as to City of Pulaski, Tennessee. (gb)
August 16, 2018 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mark E. Martin: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 9/6/2018. (gb)
August 16, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth A. Alexander. AL State Bar status verified as active for Mark E. Martin. (gb)
August 16, 2018 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
August 16, 2018 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
August 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against City of Pulaski, Tennessee (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2732711), filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Intent, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. City of Pulaski, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pulaski, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Mark E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?