McDaniel et al v. Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William McDaniel and Alexis McDaniel
Defendant: Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad Inc., Commercial Services Group Inc. and Transunion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00067
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Scott McDearman. (mg)
October 9, 2018 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Commercial Services Group Inc.. (McDearman, James)
October 9, 2018 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Commercial Services Group Inc..(McDearman, James)
October 8, 2018 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, And Affirmative Defenses by Transunion, LLC.(Policchio, James)
September 25, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Motion for James L. Policchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/25/2018. (mg)
September 25, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for David M. Anthony, and IN State Bar status verified as active for James L. Policchio. (mg)
September 24, 2018 9 MOTION for attorney(s) James L. Policchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2759708) by Transunion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate Of Good Standing)(Policchio, James)
September 24, 2018 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Transunion, LLC. (Anthony, David)
September 24, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Anthony on behalf of Transunion, LLC (Anthony, David)
September 10, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/10/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 6, 2018 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 12:30 PM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
September 6, 2018 4 Summons issued as to Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad Inc., Commercial Services Group Inc., and Transunion, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/6/2018) (mg).
September 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Keith D. Slocum. (mg)
September 6, 2018 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad Inc., Commercial Services Group Inc., Transunion, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2746256), filed by William McDaniel, Alexis McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement 2/2/2015, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dispute Letter 6/23/2016, #3 Exhibit 3 - TU letter 7-6-2018, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tradelibe Report prior to dispute 6/2018, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tradelibe Report 8/2/2018, #6 Exhibit 6 - Tradelibe Report 8/9/2018, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel et al v. Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Oregon & Pacific Railroad Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Services Group Inc.
Represented By: James Scott McDearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion, LLC
Represented By: David M. Anthony
Represented By: James L. Policchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McDaniel
Represented By: Keith D. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis McDaniel
Represented By: Keith D. Slocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?